Huskey v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Huskey
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv07014
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Motion by Sondra A. Hemeryck for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #54 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/19/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Hemeryck, Sondra)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company to Set Schedule for Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Pleading (Unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hemeryck, Sondra)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/11/2023 before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Order Number: 46837. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/4/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2023. (McGuigan, Gale)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/11/2023. State Farm's Motion to Dismiss #24 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' claim under 42 U.S.C. 3604(a) of the FHA in Count I is dismissed without prejudice. So is Plaintiffs' claim under 3605 in Count II. Huskey's claim for injunctive relief is dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' remaining claim in Count I, under 3604(b) of the FHA, survives. Plaintiffs may amend their Complaint, consistent with this Opinion, by October 2, 2023. See Opinion for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status hearing held on 9/11/2023. The Court orally addressed the Motion to Dismiss #24 on the record in open Court indicating a written Opinion is forthcoming. Mailed notice (lk, )
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Jacqueline Huskey (Tracey, David)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to stay Discovery pending ruling on Motion to Dismiss #47 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Motion by Sondra A. Hemeryck for presentment of motion to stay #47 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/11/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Hemeryck, Sondra)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company to stay Discovery (Unopposed) (Hemeryck, Sondra)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Michael Lieberman's Motion to appear pro hac vice #45 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20902412. (Lieberman, Michael)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Aisha Rich'sMotion to withdraw as attorney #42 is granted. Motion hearing set for 8/7/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Aisha Rich for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #42 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Rich, Aisha)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION by Attorney Aisha Rich to withdraw as attorney for Jacqueline Huskey. No party information provided (Rich, Aisha)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company #24 (Holmes, Patricia)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys David Tracey and Albert Powell's Motions to appear pro hac vice #35 and #34 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )A
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for leave to file excess pages #37 is granted. Motion hearing set for 7/27/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by Patricia Brown Holmes for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #37 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/27/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Holmes, Patricia)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company for leave to file excess pages for Reply Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) (Holmes, Patricia)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Lauren Abendshien (Abendshien, Lauren)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20845258. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tracey, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20845132. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Powell, Albert)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE by Jacqueline Huskeyin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company #24 (Rich, Aisha)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file oversized brief #30 is granted. Motion hearing set for 6/20/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Aisha Rich for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #30 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/20/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Rich, Aisha)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Jacqueline Huskey for Leave to File an Oversized Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Rich, Aisha)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Holmes, Patricia)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Holmes, Patricia)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule as set in Minute Entry #22 regarding Motion to Dismiss #24 stands. Response due by 6/29/2023; Reply due by 7/31/2023. Status hearing set for 9/11/2023 at 9:00 AM stands. Motion hearing set for 6/14/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Patricia Brown Holmes for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #24 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/14/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Holmes, Patricia)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Patricia)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Holmes, Patricia)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Jacqueline Huskey against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Redline Comparison of Original Complaint and First Amended Complaint)(Rich, Aisha)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to set briefing schedule #19 is granted. Amended Pleadings shall be filed by 3/31/2023. Answer or Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by 5/15/2023. Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 6/29/2023; Reply due by 7/31/2023. Status hearing is reset for 9/11/2023 at 9:00 AM. Status hearing set for 3/23/2023 and Motion hearing set for 2/28/2023 are stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing set for 2/28/2023 at 9:00 AM stands and will proceed in Courtroom 2503. Virtual hearings will be held on Fridays at 9:30 AM. Virtual hearing requests must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Aisha Rich for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #19 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/28/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Rich, Aisha)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Jacqueline Huskey to set a briefing schedule Unopposed Motion to Establish Amended Pleadings and Responsive Briefing Schedule and to Reschedule Initial Status Conference (Rich, Aisha)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Jacqueline Huskey Pro Hac Vice Addendum (Williamson, Jason)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Sarah Elizabeth Finch (Finch, Sarah)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Sondra A. Hemeryck (Hemeryck, Sondra)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Joseph Anthony Cancila, Jr (Cancila, Joseph)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Jason Williamson's Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20272857. (Williamson, Jason)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jacqueline Huskey. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company waiver sent on 1/10/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Rich, Aisha)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/23/2023 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023 which will proceed in Courtroom 2503. Virtual hearing requests must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Deborah Archer, Alexander Rose, James Crooks and Aisha Rich's Motions to appear pro hac vice #4 , #5 , #6 and #7 are granted.Mailed notice (lk, )
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20143595. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Explaination of "Retired" Status from Pennsylvania Bar)(Rich, Aisha)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20143433. on behalf of Plaintiff Jacqueline Huskey (Crooks, James)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20142575. (Rose, Alexander)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20142368. (Archer, Deborah)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Huskey by Joshua Karsh (Karsh, Joshua)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Karsh, Joshua)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Huskey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20137867.(Karsh, Joshua)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Shelia Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huskey v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Huskey
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Aisha Rich
Represented By: Alexander Rose
Represented By: Deborah N Archer
Represented By: James Wesley Crooks
Represented By: Jason Daniel Williamson
Represented By: Michael D. Lieberman
Represented By: Albert Powell
Represented By: David Hahn Tracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Finch
Represented By: Lauren Abendshien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?