Bell et al v. Pappas et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Southwest Organizing Project and Palenque Lsna
Defendant: Maria Pappas and Cook County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2022cv07061
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 2/9/2023. The defendants' agreed motion to stay #22 is granted. The case is stayed pending a decision by the Supreme Court in Tyler v. Hennepin County. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 7/5/2023, or within 7 days after the resolution of the Supreme Court. A telephonic status hearing is set for 7/12/2023 at 9:00 a.m. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Maria Pappas to stay proceedings (unopposed) (Honingford, Megan)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Maria Pappas by Anthony Michael O'Brien (O'Brien, Anthony)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS Report (Joint) by Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project (Schneider, Daniel)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Maria Pappas by Megan Marie Honingford (Honingford, Megan)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Palenque Lsna (Schneider, Daniel)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Southwest Organizing Project (Schneider, Daniel)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palenque Lsna, Michael Bell, Southwest Organizing Project, Michelle Kidd as to Maria Pappas on 12/22/2022, answer due 1/12/2023. (Roche, Brian)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Palenque Lsna, Michael Bell, Southwest Organizing Project, Michelle Kidd as to Cook County, Illinois on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. (Roche, Brian)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 2/2/2023, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 2/9/2023 at 8:55 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time #12 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 2/9/2023. (mk)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Maria Pappas for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Yeddanapudi, Prathima)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Maria Pappas by Prathima Yeddanapudi (Yeddanapudi, Prathima)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project Pursuant to Rule 5.1 of Constitutional Question (Roche, Brian)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project by William Seth Weltman (Weltman, William)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project by Daniel Joshua Schneider (Schneider, Daniel)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project by Charles Robert Watkins (Watkins, Charles)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project by John Mark Bouman (Bouman, John)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project by Lawrence Davis Wood (Wood, Lawrence)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Bell, Michelle Kidd, Palenque Lsna, Southwest Organizing Project by Brian D. Roche (Roche, Brian)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Roche, Brian)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Palenque Lsna, Michael Bell, Southwest Organizing Project, Michelle Kidd; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20142376.(Roche, Brian)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cook County, Illinois, Maria Pappas (mbh, )
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Pappas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bell
Represented By: Charles Robert Watkins
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: John Mark Bouman
Represented By: William Seth Weltman
Represented By: Lawrence Davis Wood
Represented By: Brian D. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Kidd
Represented By: Charles Robert Watkins
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: John Mark Bouman
Represented By: Lawrence Davis Wood
Represented By: Brian D. Roche
Represented By: William Seth Weltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Organizing Project
Represented By: Charles Robert Watkins
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: John Mark Bouman
Represented By: Brian D. Roche
Represented By: William Seth Weltman
Represented By: Lawrence Davis Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palenque Lsna
Represented By: Daniel Joshua Schneider
Represented By: Brian D. Roche
Represented By: Charles Robert Watkins
Represented By: John Mark Bouman
Represented By: William Seth Weltman
Represented By: Lawrence Davis Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Pappas
Represented By: Prathima Yeddanapudi
Represented By: Anthony Michael O'Brien
Represented By: Megan Marie Honingford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County, Illinois
Represented By: Prathima Yeddanapudi
Represented By: Megan Marie Honingford
Represented By: Anthony Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?