Li et al v. Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC et al
Plaintiff: Xinli Li, Xiaomei Li, Hongxin Ding, Wei Zhang, Hui Xu, Yi Wang, Zhenyang Wang, Xiaochen Jiang, Yusen Cao, Xuemeng Wu, Nana Wang, Rui Bao, Jingjian Liang, Fang Liu, Yuyang Sun, Ziyauang Zhao, Zhen Qin, Yang Xiao, Yujia Xiang, Fang Rao, Yanling Zhu, Zheyu Liu, Kecheng Chai and Li Jin
Defendant: Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC, Forefront EB-5 Fund (HCR) LLC, Jeffrey L Laytin and Jason Wei Ding
Case Number: 1:2022cv07081
Filed: December 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(2) and Stipulation of Dismissal #20 . Motion hearing set for 2/10/2023 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 7, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice per arbitration clause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ArbitrationClause)(Litowitz, Douglas)
February 6, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Minute Entry #17 was entered in error. Motion for Disclosure #13 is re-opened and Motion hearing is reset for 2/10/2023 at 9:30 AM which will proceed via Webex. Prior to the hearing, you are directed to cut and paste this hyper link into a browser: https://us-courts.webex.com/join/virginia_kendallilnd.uscourts.gov If you do not have access to a device with video capability, please use the dial in option: (650)-479-3207, the access code is: 180 698 4009. If you do have access to a device with video capability, you are directed to appear telephonically. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 6, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY by Xinli Li to MOTION by Plaintiff Xinli Li for disclosure of citizenship and affiliates per FRCP 7.1 and LR 3.2 #13 , Response #15 (Litowitz, Douglas)
February 6, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #13 is dismissed as moot, as Defense Counsel filed Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates. Motion hearing set for 2/9/2023 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 6, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Motion hearing set for 2/8/2023 is reset for 2/9/2023 at 9:15 AM which will proceed in Courtroom 2503. Virtual hearings will be held on Fridays at 9:30 AM. Virtual hearing requests must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
February 6, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Defendants Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC, Jason Wei Ding, Forefront EB-5 Fund (HCR) LLC, Jeffrey L Laytin (Hildebrand, Daniel)
February 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Eliot Litowitz for presentment of motion for disclosure #13 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 2/8/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Litowitz, Douglas)
February 2, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Xinli Li for disclosure of citizenship and affiliates per FRCP 7.1 and LR 3.2 (Litowitz, Douglas)
January 23, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 2/8/2023. Mailed notice (lk, )
January 18, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,, #1 (Hildebrand, Daniel)
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC, Jason Wei Ding, Forefront EB-5 Fund (HCR) LLC, Jeffrey L Laytin by Daniel G. Hildebrand (Hildebrand, Daniel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 3/28/2023 at 9:15 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2023 which will proceed in Courtroom 2503. Virtual hearing requests must be pre-approved by the Court. If you need to appear virtually, send the attached form to Judge Kendall's courtroom deputy. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Virtual Hearing Request Form) (lk, )
December 30, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Xinli Li on Jeffrey Laytin (Litowitz, Douglas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Xinli Li on Forefront EB-5 Fund (HCR) LLC (Litowitz, Douglas)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Xinli Li on Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC (Litowitz, Douglas)
December 29, 2022 Filing 5 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Xinli Li on Defendant Jason Wei Ding (Litowitz, Douglas)
December 19, 2022 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC, Jason Wei Ding, Forefront EB-5 Fund (HCR) LLC, Jeffrey L Laytin (dxb, )
December 16, 2022 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mbh, )
December 16, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mbh, )
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rui Bao, Yusen Cao, Kecheng Chai, Hongxin Ding, Xiaochen Jiang, Li Jin, Xiaomei Li, Xinli Li, Jingjian Liang, Fang Liu, Zheyu Liu, Zhen Qin, Fang Rao, Yuyang Sun, Nana Wang, Yi Wang, Zhenyang Wang, Xuemeng Wu, Yujia Xiang, Yang Xiao, Hui Xu, Wei Zhang, Ziyauang Zhao, Yanling Zhu by Douglas Eliot Litowitz (Litowitz, Douglas)
December 15, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Litowitz, Douglas)
December 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF 24 PLAINTIFFS filed by Zhen Qin; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20146513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PPM, #2 Exhibit Subscription Agreement, #3 Exhibit LLC Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit TD Investment Confirmations, #5 Exhibit Forefront Letter, #6 Exhibit Books and Records Demand, #7 Declaration Declaration Douglas Litowitz, #8 Exhibit Letter on Failed Books and Records Production, #9 Exhibit Aliases of Jason Ding)(Litowitz, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li et al v. Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xinli Li
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaomei Li
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongxin Ding
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei Zhang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Xu
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Wang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhenyang Wang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaochen Jiang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yusen Cao
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuemeng Wu
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nana Wang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rui Bao
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingjian Liang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fang Liu
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuyang Sun
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziyauang Zhao
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhen Qin
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Xiao
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yujia Xiang
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fang Rao
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanling Zhu
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zheyu Liu
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kecheng Chai
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Li Jin
Represented By: Douglas Eliot Litowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coconut Beach/Hawaii LLC
Represented By: Daniel G. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forefront EB-5 Fund (HCR) LLC
Represented By: Daniel G. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L Laytin
Represented By: Daniel G. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wei Ding
Represented By: Daniel G. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?