ABC Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A
Plaintiff: ABC Corporation
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A
Case Number: 1:2023cv00075
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy L Maldonado
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by ABC Corporation Establishing that Joinder is Proper (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor, #2 Exhibit 1)(Trainor, Martin)
January 13, 2023 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: The Court has reviewed the pending motions and Plaintiff's amended complaint #17 . Plaintiff's motion for leave to temporarily proceed under a pseudonym #19 is granted, exceptional circumstances having been shown. The ability to proceed under a pseudonym will expire 7 days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's motion for an ex parte temporary restraining order, and Plaintiff shall add its name to the docket at that time. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file certain documents under seal #19 is also granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process #24 is granted because electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it effectively communicates the pendency of this action to Defendants. See, e.g., Oakley, Inc. v. Partnerships & Unincorporated Associations Identified in Schedule "A," No. 20-CV-05049, 2021 WL 2894166, at *5 (N.D. Ill. July 9, 2021) (finding electronic service proper in similar circumstances). However, before it can rule on Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #21 , the Court orders Plaintiff to file a brief addressing the issue of joinder of all Defendants by 2/3/2023. Finally, Plaintiff's previous motion for leave to file certain documents under seal and temporarily proceed under a pseudonym #10 is denied as moot. (ca, )
January 10, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by ABC Corporation in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Trainor, Martin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Trainor, Martin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Declaration of Paul Varley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3-1, #5 Exhibit 3-2, #6 Exhibit 3-3, #7 Exhibit 3-4, #8 Exhibit 3-5, #9 Exhibit 3-6)(Trainor, Martin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor, #2 Exhibit 1)(Trainor, Martin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 21 SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by ABC Corporation in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal and Temporarily Proceed Under a Pseudonym (Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Notice of Trademark Claims (Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Schedule A)(Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Schedule A regarding amended complaint #13 (Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 2 regarding amended complaint #13 (Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 14 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 1 regarding amended complaint #13 (Trainor, Martin)
January 9, 2023 Filing 13 Redacted AMENDED complaint by ABC Corporation against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5)(Trainor, Martin)
January 6, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mbh, )
January 6, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mbh, )
January 5, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Sameeul Haque (Haque, Sameeul)
January 5, 2023 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by ABC Corporation in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff ABC Corporation for Leave to File Certain Documents Under Seal and Temporarily Proceed Under a Pseudonym (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ABC Corporation by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Notice of Trademark Claims (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Notice of Affiliates (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Schedule A)(Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 2 regarding complaint #1 (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff ABC Corporation Exhibit 1 regarding complaint #1 (Trainor, Martin)
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Redacted filed by ABC Corporation; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20207769. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5)(Trainor, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Corporation
Represented By: Sameeul Haque
Represented By: Martin Francis Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified On Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?