Lindberg v. Patricia et al
Plaintiff: Lena Marie Lindberg
Defendant: Chapman Rego Patricia, Patricia M. Rego, Edward M. Fitzgerald and Vincent A. Citro
Case Number: 1:2023cv00265
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's motions for leave to appeal in forma pauperis #12 #13 are denied. Plaintiff is the subject of a circuit-wide filing bar, see #8 , and this court certifies that an appeal is not taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. s. 1915(a)(3). Nothing in plaintiff's submissions suggests a good-faith basis to appeal the decision that her complaint in this case was barred by a prior final judgment related to the same facts. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 13 SECOND EMERGENCY AMENDED MOTION by Plaintiff Lena Marie Lindberg for leave of court to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis (jg, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Lena Marie Lindberg of Change of Address (jg, )
February 21, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Lena Marie Lindberg for leave of court to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis (jg, )
January 27, 2023 MAILED a copy of order and judgment dated 1/26/2023 to Plaintiff. (jg, )
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 ENTERED JUDGMENT. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this judgment and order #9 to plaintiff. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 26, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff submitted a complaint that attempts to sue over 150 defendants, most of whom plaintiff alleges are based in Florida. It seems plaintiff is alleging that she was wrongfully arrested in Des Plaines, Illinois, on January 26, 2022, and transported to Florida as part of a continuing series of threats, attacks, and fraudulent activity against her. Plaintiff previously filed a case about the same January 26, 2022 arrest. See Case No. 22 CV 2214 (N.D. Ill.). That case was dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim and as legally frivolous. Id. at Docket No. 9, 10. That was a final judgment and plaintiff cannot file another suit about the same event. This case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to screening, 28 U.S.C. s. 1915(e). Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees and motion to file documents under seal #3 #6 are denied as moot. Enter judgment and terminate case. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 SANCTIONS ORDER dated 03/24/2016 from the 7th Circuit: IT IS ORDERED that Lindberg is sanctioned $2000 for filing a frivolous petition. Within fourteen days of the date of this order, Lindberg must tender a check payable to the clerk of this court for the full amount of the sanction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that unless and until Lindberg pays in full this sanction, the clerks of all federal courts in this circuit are directed to return unfiled any papers submitted either directly or indirectly by her or on her behalf. See In re City of Chicago, 500 F.3d 582, 585-86 (7th Cir. 2007); Support Sys. Int'l, Inc. v. Mack, 45 F.3d 185, 186 (7th Cir. 1995). In accordance with our decision in Mack, exceptions to this filing bar are made for criminal cases and for applications for writs of habeas corpus. See Mack, 45 F.3d at 186-87. This order will be lifted immediately once Lindberg makes full payment. See City of Chicago, 500 F.3d at 585-86. If Lindberg, despite her best efforts, is unable to pay in full the sanction, no earlier than two years from the date of this order she is authorized to submit to this court a motion to modify or rescind this order. See id.; Mack, 45 F.3d at 186. (jg, )
January 18, 2023 MAILED copy of clerk's notice and consent form to Plaintiff (jg, )
January 18, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jg, )
January 18, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lena Marie Lindberg of related case (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST by Plaintiff Lena Marie Lindberg to file documents under seal (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Lena Marie Lindberg (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis #3 (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lena Marie Lindberg for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (jg, )
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT and 0 copies by Lena Marie Lindberg (Exhibits) (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindberg v. Patricia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena Marie Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Rego Patricia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia M. Rego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent A. Citro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?