Dillon et al v. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Dillon and Marc Kafka
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00684
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Benjamin Bright and Matthew Fenn's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 and #8 are granted. Defendant's joint motion to defer submission of initial status report is granted and status report deadline is stricken. Counsel is reminded that all motions shall be noticed or may be stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC(Joint Motion to Defer Submission of Initial Status Report) (Nale, Lucia)
March 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20448565. (Fenn, Matthew)
March 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20448245. (Bright, Benjamin)
March 3, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's stipulation and unopposed motion for extension of time #5 , which is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 4/17/2023. Should Defendant move to transfer this case to the Southern District of New York on or before 4/17/2023, Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before 5/17/2023; reply shall be filed on or before 6/2/2023. Counsel is reminded that all motions shall be filed correctly using the motion event and all motions shall also be presented for hearing based upon Judge Blakey's standing order and dates located on his webpage. Any failure to properly file or notice motions may result in the motion being stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 2, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Nale, Lucia)
March 2, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Lucia Nale (Nale, Lucia)
February 28, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Dillon, Marc Kafka as to Wells Fargo Securities, LLC on 2/7/2023, answer due 2/28/2023. (Malmstrom, Carl)
February 7, 2023 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 3/20/2023, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at Gloria_Lewis@ilnd.uscourts.gov. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
February 6, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (lm, )
February 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) filed by Michael Dillon, Marc Kafka; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20315769. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl)
February 3, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
February 3, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon et al v. Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dillon
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Kafka
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Bright
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Matthew Fenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?