Steele v. Randall et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Steele
Defendant: Lori J. Randall, Keenan S. Gale, TJ Hathaway, Robert J. Alpern, M.D., Roxanne S. Austin, Sally E. Blount, Ph.D., Paola Gonzalez, Michelle A. Kumbier, Darren W. McDew, Robert B. Ford, Nancy McKinstry, William A. Osborn, Michael F. Roman, Daniel J. Starks, John G. Stratton, Glenn F. Tilton, Robert E. Funck, Jr., Joseph Manning, Christopher J. Calamari and Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 1:2023cv00850
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Glenn F. Tilton waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Daniel J. Starks waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Michael F. Roman waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Lori J. Randall waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. William A. Osborn waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Nancy McKinstry waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Darren W. McDew waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Joseph Manning waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Michelle A. Kumbier waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Keenan S. Gale waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. John G. Stratton waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. TJ Hathaway waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Paola Gonzalez waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Robert E. Funck, Jr. waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Robert B. Ford waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Christopher J. Calamari waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Sally E. Blount, Ph.D. waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Roxanne S. Austin waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Steele. Robert J. Alpern, M.D. waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Bottini, Francis)
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4 of this Court, I find the above captioned case, presently pending on the calendar of Judge Matthew F. Kennelly to be related to 22-CV-05513 which is pending on my calendar. Accordingly, I request that the Executive Committee order said case to be reassigned to my calendar as a related case. Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah and Magistrate Judge Sheila M. Finnegan for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly and Magistrate Judge Jeffrey Cole no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 02/16/2023. (daj, )
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Steele by Francis A Bottini (Bottini, Francis)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Stockholder Derivative Complaint filed by Matthew Steele; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20339529. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bottini, Francis)
February 10, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
February 10, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Randall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Steele
Represented By: Francis A Bottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keenan S. Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Alpern, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne S. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally E. Blount, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle A. Kumbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren W. McDew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy McKinstry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn F. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Funck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?