Kirby v. Sheehan
Plaintiff: Myles Kirby
Defendant: Joseph C. Sheehan also known as Joseph Mary Sheehan also known as Joseph CM Sheehan doing business as BMP Galway LLC, Joseph Mary Sheehan, Joseph CM Sheehan, Norah E. Sheehan, James J. Sheehan, Frances P. Crowley, Mark J. Crowley, Immersion Solutions Lab LLC, BMP Galway LLC, Jasblack Global Limited, Medistead Ireland Limited and Miller Bridge Limited
Case Number: 1:2023cv00936
Filed: February 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Telephonic status hearing held on 4/14/2023. Plaintiff's attorney fails to appear. Plaintiff's attorney failed to file a status report. The plaintiff is ordered to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a response to the order to show cause in writing by 4/19/2023. A telephonic status and order to show cause hearings are set for on 4/21/2023 at 8:45 a.m. plaintiff is ordered to appear. The following call-in number will be used for the hearing: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (mma, )
March 21, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 4/7/2023, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 4/14/2023 at 9:10 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
March 21, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Norah E. Sheehan on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Mark J. Crowley on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Joseph C. Sheehan on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to James J. Sheehan on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Immersion Solution Labs LLC on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Frances P. Crowley on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to BMP Galway LLC on 2/16/2023 by Plaintiff Myles Kirby. Waiver of service due by 3/20/2023. (Mannlein, Melinda)
March 21, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BMP Galway LLC, Frances P. Crowley, Mark J. Crowley, Immersion Solutions Lab LLC, James J. Sheehan, Joseph C. Sheehan, Norah E. Sheehan (sxh, )
February 16, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jasblack Global Limited, Medistead Ireland Limited, Miller Bridge Limited (khg, )
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Myles Kirby (Mannlein, Melinda)
February 15, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Myles Kirby by Melinda L Mannlein (Mannlein, Melinda)
February 15, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mannlein, Melinda)
February 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Myles Kirby; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20351180.(Mannlein, Melinda)
February 15, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
February 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Sheehan also known as Joseph Mary Sheehan also known as Joseph CM Sheehan doing business as BMP Galway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Mary Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph CM Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norah E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances P. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immersion Solutions Lab LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMP Galway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasblack Global Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medistead Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Bridge Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myles Kirby
Represented By: Melinda L Mannlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?