Macklin v. The National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Charlotte Macklin
Defendant: The National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a AMTRAK and The National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2023cv00959
Filed: February 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Referring Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED complaint by Charlotte Macklin against The National Railroad Passenger Corporation Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Redline Complaint)(Chavez, Elizabeth)
April 13, 2023 Filing 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Jeffrey Cummings for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: Discovery supervision and all discovery disputes without authority to extend the discovery cutoff date. The referral to the magistrate judge shall also include authority to conduct a settlement conference if deemed appropriate. Mailed notice. (kp, )
April 13, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court has reviewed the parties' initial status report and sets the following schedule. Initial disclosures shall be exchanged no later than April 28, 2023. Amendment of pleadings (after the anticipated amended complaint by Plaintiff on April 17, 2023) and joinder of parties to be completed by July 13, 2023. Fact discovery to be completed by September 29, 2023. While the parties indicate that, at this time, they do not anticipate any expert discovery, the parties shall file a statement on September 1, 2023 indicating whether any experts will be named. Discovery supervision and all discovery motions and discovery disputes, including requests for and entry of any protective orders, are referred to the magistrate judge without authority to extend the fact discovery deadline. The referral to the magistrate judge shall include participation in settlement discussions, should the parties request such assistance. Status hearing set for October 3, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (kp, )
April 13, 2023 Filing 15 STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL by Charlotte Macklin (Chavez, Elizabeth)
March 27, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's partial motion to dismiss #12 is due April 17, 2023, and Defendant's reply is due May 1, 2023. Ruling to be made via electronic notification. Mailed notice. (kp, )
March 24, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by The National Railroad Passenger Corporation in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 / DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Mroueh, Yara)
March 24, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The National Railroad Passenger Corporation / DEFENDANT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Mroueh, Yara)
March 15, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Yara Mroueh (Mroueh, Yara)
March 15, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Michael A. Wilder (Wilder, Michael)
March 14, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The parties are directed to confer no later than 4/7/2023 to discuss the nature and bases of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and they shall also discuss deadlines for any Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures that have not already been exchanged and a proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff is responsible for initiating such a conference, and all lead counsel for all parties must participate. In lieu of an initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written initial status report and proposed discovery plan by 4/14/2023. Failure or refusal to participate in such a conference or to cooperate in the preparation of the written report may constitute a basis for sanctions. After the Court receives the parties' report, it will issue an order setting a discovery schedule, if appropriate. The parties are advised that the Court generally does not delay discovery based on pending motions to dismiss. Mailed notice. (kp, )
March 9, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Macklin as to The National Railroad Passenger Corporation on 3/8/2023, answer due 3/29/2023. (Chavez, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charlotte Macklin by Peter Lawrence Currie (Currie, Peter)
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charlotte Macklin by Kathleen Currie Chavez (Chavez, Kathleen)
February 16, 2023 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chavez, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.1# requires at the time of filing a case, plaintiff's counsel, or if the case is filed pro se, the plaintiff shall file with the original papers a completed designation sheet (civil cover sheet). No civil cover sheet was submitted at the time of filing this matter. Charlotte Macklin is directed to file the #Civil Cover Sheet# within 14 days of this notification. Signed by the Executive Committee. (lm, )
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charlotte Macklin by Bret Koch Pufahl (Pufahl, Bret)
February 16, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Charlotte Macklin by Elizabeth Christine Chavez (Chavez, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Charlotte Macklin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20355108. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Chavez, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )
February 16, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a AMTRAK (khg, )
February 16, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macklin v. The National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Macklin
Represented By: Bret Koch Pufahl
Represented By: Kathleen Currie Chavez
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Chavez
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a AMTRAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Michael A. Wilder
Represented By: Yara Mroueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?