Harris v. Eagle Valley Ventures et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Harris
Defendant: Eagle Valley Ventures doing business as Eagle Valley Lending, Fast Auto Loans Inc. and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv01114
Filed: February 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 3, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed the parties' status report #21 . The Parties again state this matter is settling and intend to file a stipulation within 30 days. They further request that all deadlines be stayed. As such, the Court directs the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal or a status report explaining the delay by 05/05/2023. All pending deadlines are stayed. Emailed notice (axc).
March 31, 2023 Filing 21 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Joshua Harris (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 30, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court has reviewed the parties' notice of settlement & request to stay deadlines #10 . The parties state that they have resolved this matter and expect to file dismissal papers within the next sixty days. They further request that the Court stay all pending deadlines. However, days later Defendant Fast Auto Loans Inc. filed a motion to dismiss #12 . As such, by 03/31/2023, the parties are directed to file a status report informing the Court on how the parties intend to proceed. Emailed notice (axc).
March 24, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorneys Mark Reeves and Rob Roy Smith motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #17 #18 are granted. Emailed notice (axc).
March 23, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20471886. (Smith, Rob roy)
March 23, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20471802. (Reeves, Mark)
March 21, 2023 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Robert I. Reich regarding motion to dismiss #12 , memorandum in support of motion #13 (Friedman, Alyssa)
March 21, 2023 Filing 15 Notification as to Affiliates by Fast Auto Loans Inc. (Friedman, Alyssa)
March 21, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alyssa Friedman regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Friedman, Alyssa)
March 21, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Fast Auto Loans Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #12 (Friedman, Alyssa)
March 21, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Fast Auto Loans Inc. to dismiss Complaint for Individual and Class Relief (Friedman, Alyssa)
March 21, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fast Auto Loans Inc. by Alyssa Harley Friedman (Friedman, Alyssa)
March 16, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Settlement and Request to Stay Deadlines by Joshua Harris (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 7, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Harris as to Fast Auto Loans Inc. on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 1, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Harris as to Eagle Valley Ventures on 2/27/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
February 24, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 05/09/2023 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Emailed notice (axc).
February 24, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, )
February 24, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, )
February 24, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Eagle Valley Ventures, Fast Auto Loans Inc. (smb, )
February 23, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
February 23, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
February 23, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
February 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Joshua Harris; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20373980. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Eagle Valley Ventures et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Harris
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Valley Ventures doing business as Eagle Valley Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Auto Loans Inc.
Represented By: Rob roy Roy Smith
Represented By: Alyssa Harley Friedman
Represented By: Mark Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?