Shankar et al v. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shobana Shankar and Raghavendra Jayanth Chakravarthy
Defendant: FAIRVIEW AVENUE PROPERTIES LLC, 18350 TORRENCE LLC, TCF NATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC., MON AMI TCF LLC, LAURENA MIKOSZ a/k/a LORI MIKOSZ, Kathleen Long, CHASE REAL ESTATE, LLC, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC, MAINSTREET PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, EJ INVESTMENT GROUP INC., TORRENCE 2 LLC, 2118 BLUE ISLAND LLC, 1630 N 1 LLC, ILLINOIS ASSETS LLC, ANAND SHETH, CITYPOINT ILLINOIS LLC, ROBERT RIXER, Rachel Irwin, Marcin Chojnacki and Laurena Mikosz
Case Number: 1:2023cv01469
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by EJ Investment Group INC. (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Citypoint Illinois LLC (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Torrence 2 LLC (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 1630 N 1 LLC (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mainstreet Property Management LLC (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 2118 Blue Island LLC (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Illinois Assets LLC (Sadic, Muamer)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by Michael Richard Spanel (Spanel, Michael)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Seven defendants filed notices of appearance on 4/25/2023 (see document nos. 23-29). Counsel are advised that no substantive action can be taken in this case until all notifications of affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 have been filed. Because defendants have waived service of the summons and complaint, the deadline to file a joint initial status report is extended to and including 5/31/2023. All notifications of affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 are due on or before 5/15/2023. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Citypoint Illinois LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. 1630 N 1 LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. 2118 Blue Island LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Torrence 2 LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. EJ Investment Group INC. waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Mainstreet Property Management LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Illinois Assets LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2023, answer due 6/6/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 1630 N 1 LLC by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 2118 Blue Island LLC by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Torrence 2 LLC by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Illinois Assets LLC by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mainstreet Property Management LLC by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant EJ Investment Group INC. by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Citypoint Illinois LLC by Muamer Michael Sadic (Sadic, Muamer)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Mon Ami TCF LLC waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Chase Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 3/29/2023, answer due 5/29/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Anand Sheth waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Laurena Mikosz waiver sent on 4/3/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Shobana Shankar. Marcin Chojnacki waiver sent on 3/15/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (AMENDED) (Henderson, Matthew)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Johnathon Christian Koechley (Koechley, Johnathon)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chase Real Estate, LLC and Disclosure Statement (Henderson, Matthew)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (Henderson, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC (Amended) (Katz, Jefferey)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC's Local Rule 3.2 notification #9 of affiliates discloses one "publicly-held affiliate that owns more than 5% of [Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC's] shares." For purposes of Local Rule 3.2, "'affiliate' is defined as any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party." N.D. Ill. LR 3.2(a). Every notice of affiliates must disclose all individuals and entities meeting this amended definition, including any privately held affiliates of a party. Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC is directed to file an amended notification of affiliates on or before 4/25/2023. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC (Katz, Jefferey)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Counsel for defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC is advised that no further action may be taken until all notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 have been filed. Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC's notification as to affiliates must be filed on or before 4/20/2023. Mailed notice (mjc, )
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rachel Irwin by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Raghavendra Jayanth Chakravarthy, Shobana Shankar by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 1630 N 1 LLC, 18350 Torrence LLC, 2118 Blue Island LLC, Chase Real Estate, LLC, Marcin Chojnacki, Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group INC., Fairview Avenue Properties LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Rachel Irwin, Kathleen Long, Mainstreet Property Management LLC, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC, Laurena Mikosz, Mon Ami TCF LLC, Robert Rixer, Anand Sheth, TCF National Holdings, Inc., Torrence 2 LLC (sxh, )
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order ALIAS SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant TCF National Holdings, Inc. (smb, ) Modified on 3/15/2023 (smb, ).
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before May 12, 2023. In conformity with General Order 21-0027 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing and for requirements for status reports and discovery plans during the COVID-19 pandemic. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all parties have appeared or been served. If all parties have not appeared or been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/13/2023. Mailed notice(mjc, )
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Raghavendra Jayanth Chakravarthy, Shobana Shankar by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Raghavendra Jayanth Chakravarthy, Shobana Shankar by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Raghavendra Jayanth Chakravarthy, Shobana Shankar; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20423937. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Gaspero, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shankar et al v. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shobana Shankar
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raghavendra Jayanth Chakravarthy
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRVIEW AVENUE PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18350 TORRENCE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF NATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MON AMI TCF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURENA MIKOSZ a/k/a LORI MIKOSZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE REAL ESTATE, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Henderson
Represented By: Johnathon Christian Koechley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINSTREET PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ INVESTMENT GROUP INC.
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENCE 2 LLC
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2118 BLUE ISLAND LLC
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1630 N 1 LLC
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILLINOIS ASSETS LLC
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANAND SHETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITYPOINT ILLINOIS LLC
Represented By: Muamer Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RIXER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Irwin
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurena Mikosz
Represented By: Michael R. Spanel
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?