Patinkin v. MTGLQ Investors, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Seth S. Patinkin
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors, L.P., Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 1:2023cv01580
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Filing 16 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 4/20/2023 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (rp, )
April 20, 2023 Filing 17 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice(rp, )
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER : Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for remand #11 is granted. As discussed, Plaintiff did not intend to bring any federal claims in his complaint. Counts II and VI are dismissed. It is hereby ordered that this case be remanded back to the Chancery Division of Cook County Circuit Court in the State of Illinois, forthwith. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/20/2023. Mailed notice (rp, )
April 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Wright, Alexander)
April 12, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court enters and continues Plaintiff's motion to remand #11 and the status date to 4/20/2023 at 1:45 p.m. The Court instructs Defendants to be prepared to discuss why the Court should not remand this case to the Circuit Court of Cook County when Plaintiff states that none of his claims are federal claims in his complaint. If Defendants do not object to Plaintiff's motion to remand #11 , they may file a notice of agreement on the docket prior to the next status date. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Seth S. Patinkin re MOTION by Plaintiff Seth S. Patinkin to remand #11 (rp, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Seth S. Patinkin for remand (Exhibits) (rp, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Seth S. Patinkin of Appearance. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(rp, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 9 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Seth S. Patinkin (rp, )
April 6, 2023 Filing 8 STATUS Report (Joint) by MTGLQ Investors, L.P., Newrez LLC (Wright, Alexander)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #5 . The Court will set a date for Defendants' responsive pleading after the initial status date. The initial status conference in this matter is set for 4/13/2023 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 4/6/2023. If Plaintiff intends to file a motion for remand, the parties must include a proposed briefing schedule in their initial status report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander Nicholas Wright for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/28/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Wright, Alexander)
March 15, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendants MTGLQ Investors, L.P., Newrez LLC for extension of time to file answer (Wright, Alexander)
March 15, 2023 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ak, )
March 15, 2023 MAILED Clerk's Notice, Blank Joint Consent Form, blank Pro Se Appearance Form to Seth S. Patinkin (ak, )
March 14, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MTGLQ Investors, L.P., Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing by Alexander Nicholas Wright (Wright, Alexander)
March 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wright, Alexander)
March 14, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2022CH06447) filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P., Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20437658. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Wright, Alexander)
March 14, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, )
March 14, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (khg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patinkin v. MTGLQ Investors, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth S. Patinkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?