Hall v. Ascend Loans, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Hall
Defendant: Ascend Loans, LLC, Uprova Holdings LLC, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Pomo One Marketing Inc., Habemco LLC, Genel Ilyasova, Michael Scott Hammer, Denise Dehaemers, Sarah Marie Himmler, David Stover and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv01722
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Ascend Loans, LLC, Denise DeHaemers, Habemco LLC, Michael Scott Hammer, Sarah Marie Himmler, Genel Ilyasova, Pomo One Marketing Inc., David Stover, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Uprova Holdings LLC in support of motion to stay,, #22 (Croker, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Ascend Loans, LLC, Denise DeHaemers, Habemco LLC, Michael Scott Hammer, Sarah Marie Himmler, Genel Ilyasova, Pomo One Marketing Inc., David Stover, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Uprova Holdings LLC to stay regarding MOTION by Defendants Ascend Loans, LLC, Denise DeHaemers, Habemco LLC, Michael Scott Hammer, Sarah Marie Himmler, Genel Ilyasova, Pomo One Marketing Inc., David Stover, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Uprova Holdings LLC to compel Individual A #20 , memorandum in support of motion, #21 (Croker, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Ascend Loans, LLC, Denise DeHaemers, Habemco LLC, Michael Scott Hammer, Sarah Marie Himmler, Genel Ilyasova, Pomo One Marketing Inc., David Stover, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Uprova Holdings LLC in support of motion to compel, #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Croker, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Ascend Loans, LLC, Denise DeHaemers, Habemco LLC, Michael Scott Hammer, Sarah Marie Himmler, Genel Ilyasova, Pomo One Marketing Inc., David Stover, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Uprova Holdings LLC to compel Individual Arbitration (Croker, Paul)
April 19, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The unopposed extension motion to respond to the complaint #15 is granted to 05/19/2023. The tracking status hearing of 05/12/2023 is reset to 06/02/2023 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the joint initial status report on 05/26/2023 (instead of 05/04/2023). Emailed notice (mw, )
April 17, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Paul Croker's moiton for leave to appear pro hac vice for the Defendants #17 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, )
April 14, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20540777. (Croker, Paul)
April 12, 2023 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Habemco LLC (Campbell, Andrew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Habemco LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Campbell, Andrew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Habemco LLC by Andrew Dylan Campbell (Campbell, Andrew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Hall as to Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc. on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Hall as to Pomo One Marketing Inc. on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Hall as to David Stover on 4/4/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 05/12/2023 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 05/04/2023. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendants have not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If not all Defendants have been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel (or the parties, if proceeding pro se) must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel (or the party, if proceeding pro se) must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Hall as to Ascend Loans, LLC on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 29, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Hall as to Habemco LLC on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Hall as to Sarah Marie Himmler on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 22, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Ascend Loans, LLC, Denise DeHaemers, Habemco LLC, Michael Scott Hammer, Sarah Marie Himmler, Genel Ilyasova, Pomo One Marketing Inc., David Stover, Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc., Uprova Holdings LLC (jb, )
March 21, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )
March 21, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
March 20, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
March 20, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
March 20, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Matthew Hall; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20456743. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Ascend Loans, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hall
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascend Loans, LLC
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uprova Holdings LLC
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upper Lake Processing Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pomo One Marketing Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habemco LLC
Represented By: Andrew Dylan Campbell
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genel Ilyasova
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Hammer
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Dehaemers
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Marie Himmler
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stover
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?