Gray v. Evanston of et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Gray
Defendant: City Evanston of, Officer Kubiak, Officer Kane, Officer Popp, Officer Rosenbaum, Officer Pogorzelski and Officer Brown
Case Number: 1:2023cv01931
Filed: March 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to amended complaint by City Evanston of, Officer Kane, Officer Kubiak, Officer Pogorzelski, Officer Popp, Officer Rosenbaum (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice)(Ruggie, Alexandra)
May 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED complaint by Alexander Gray against City Evanston of, Officer Kane, Officer Kubiak, Officer Pogorzelski, Officer Popp, Officer Rosenbaum and terminating Officer Brown (Flaxman, Kenneth)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Evanston of, Officer Kane, Officer Kubiak, Officer Pogorzelski, Officer Popp, Officer Rosenbaum by Marchant Johnson (Johnson, Marchant)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Evanston of, Officer Kane, Officer Kubiak, Officer Pogorzelski, Officer Popp, Officer Rosenbaum by Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie (Ruggie, Alexandra)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants City Evanston of, Officer Kane, Officer Kubiak, Officer Pogorzelski, Officer Popp, Officer Rosenbaum by Nicholas E Cummings (Cummings, Nicholas)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Officer Rosenbaum, Officer Kubiak, Officer Pogorzelski, City Evanston of, Officer Kane, Officer Popp. Officer Rosenbaum waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/29/2023; Officer Kubiak waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/29/2023; Officer Pogorzelski waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/29/2023; City Evanston of waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/29/2023; Officer Kane waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/29/2023; Officer Popp waiver sent on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/29/2023. (Cummings, Nicholas)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by June 11, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alexander Gray by Kenneth N Flaxman (Flaxman, Kenneth)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alexander Gray by Joel A. Flaxman (Flaxman, Joel)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flaxman, Kenneth)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alexander Gray; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20483613.(Flaxman, Kenneth)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Evanston of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Gray
Represented By: Joel A. Flaxman
Represented By: Kenneth N Flaxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Evanston of
Represented By: Nicholas E Cummings
Represented By: Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie
Represented By: Marchant Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kubiak
Represented By: Nicholas E Cummings
Represented By: Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie
Represented By: Marchant Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kane
Represented By: Marchant Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas E Cummings
Represented By: Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Popp
Represented By: Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie
Represented By: Marchant Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas E Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rosenbaum
Represented By: Nicholas E Cummings
Represented By: Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie
Represented By: Marchant Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Pogorzelski
Represented By: Nicholas E Cummings
Represented By: Alexandra Brien MacKey Ruggie
Represented By: Marchant Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?