Sor v. TCF National Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Sor
Defendant: TCF NATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC., Marcin Chojnacki, Laurena Mikosz, Kathleen Long, CHASE REAL ESTATE, LLC, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC, MAINSTREET PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC, EJ INVESTMENT GROUP INC., CITYPOINT ILLINOIS LLC and Rachel Irwin
Case Number: 1:2023cv02401
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint Discovery Plan by Jonathan Sor (Gaspero, Lisa)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 6/30/2023; Response due by 8/4/2023; Reply due by 8/18/2023. Status hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Virginia M. Kendall is presiding over 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, and the Hon. Jeffrey T. Gilbert as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Kendall shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Gilbert shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. 23 CV 1469 Shankar, et al. v. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC et al; 23 CV 1569 Haynes v. Fairview Avenue Properties, LLC et al; 23 CV 1691 Abbas v. Mikosz et al; 23 CV 2401 Sor v. TCF National Holdings, Inc. et al; 23 CV 2520 Chen et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2546 Michel et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2858 Said et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 3173 Stafford v. Chojnacki et al. Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable John F. Kness no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/2023. Mailed notice (td, )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Sor as to Kathleen Long on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kathleen Long (smb, )
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chase Real Estate, LLC (Koechley, Johnathon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Johnathon Christian Koechley (Koechley, Johnathon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (Henderson, Matthew)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Sor. Chase Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 5/9/2023: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 6/21/2023 at 9:30 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, )
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by Michael Richard Spanel (Spanel, Michael)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rachel Irwin by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Sor. Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jonathan Sor. Rachel Irwin waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Jonathan Sor regarding complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Jonathan Sor regarding complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonathan Sor by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonathan Sor by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaspero, Lisa)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan Sor; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20549714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, )
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sor v. TCF National Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Sor
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF NATIONAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurena Mikosz
Represented By: Michael R. Spanel
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE REAL ESTATE, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Henderson
Represented By: Johnathon Christian Koechley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINSTREET PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ INVESTMENT GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITYPOINT ILLINOIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Irwin
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?