Lake County, Illinois v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: Lake County, Illinois
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. (FORMERLY EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY), Express Scripts, Inc., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, Medco Health Solutions, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optum, Inc., OPTUMRX INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. and Evernorth Health, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02402
Filed: April 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: LaShonda A Hunt
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 37 Appearance by Lake County, Illinois John M. Power (Power, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Brandon L. Bogle Attorney Appearance Form (Bogle, Brandon)
June 5, 2023 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt. Therefore, in light of the reassignment, all pending dates before this court are stricken. Parties to take note of Judge Hunt's standing order posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
June 2, 2023 Filing 34 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 23-0023: IT APPEARING THAT, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable LaShonda A Hunt; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 282 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Lashonda A Hunt; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable LaShonda A Hunt's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable LaShonda A Hunt to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Lashonda A Hunt to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Hunt shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/02/2023.(tg, )
May 25, 2023 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Eli Lilly and Company (Moorman, Ryan)
May 25, 2023 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Ryan Moorman (Moorman, Ryan)
May 25, 2023 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Jason Adam Feld (Feld, Jason)
May 25, 2023 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Diana M. Watral (Watral, Diana)
May 25, 2023 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eli Lilly and Company by Andrew A. Kassof (Kassof, Andrew)
May 25, 2023 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice of Steven J. Daroci as counsel for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois #27 is granted. Mailed notice. (pmh)
May 24, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20668277. Steven Daroci (Daroci, Steven)
May 16, 2023 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Agreed motion for an extension of time for all defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint #24 is granted to 7/14/2023. Scheduling Conference is reset for 8/11/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance required). The joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 8/4/2023. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
May 15, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Patricia Brown Holmes for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/18/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Holmes, Patricia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant OPTUMRX INC. for extension of time for all Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Associated Briefing Deadlines (Agreed) (Holmes, Patricia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by OPTUMRX INC. and Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Holmes, Patricia)
May 15, 2023 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant OPTUMRX INC. by Lucas Thor Rael (Rael, Lucas)
May 15, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant OPTUMRX INC. by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
May 8, 2023 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Tal J Lifshitz (Lifshitz, Tal)
May 8, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Javier Asis Lopez (Lopez, Javier)
May 8, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Daniel Thomas DiClemente (DiClemente, Daniel)
May 3, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice of Daniel Thomas DiClemente #13 , Tal J. Lifshitz #15 and Javier A. Lopez #16 as counsel for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois are granted. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/3/2023 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance required). The joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 6/26/2023. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (pmh)
April 26, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20578946. (Lopez, Javier)
April 26, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20578700. (Lifshitz, Tal)
April 25, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Matthew D. Schultz (Schultz, Matthew)
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20572225. (DiClemente, Daniel)
April 24, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Rachel Sullivan (Sullivan, Rachel)
April 24, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Jorge Luis Piedra (Piedra, Jorge)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski (Widlanski, Benjamin)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motions to appear pro hac vice #7 , #8 are granted. Attorneys Jorge Luis Piedra and Rachel Sullivan are added as counsel for Lake County, Illinois. Mailed notice (ags)
April 21, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20564317. (Sullivan, Rachel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20563267. (Piedra, Jorge)
April 21, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Attorney Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski is added as counsel for Lake County, Illinois. Mailed notice (ags)
April 20, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20560767. (Widlanski, Benjamin)
April 20, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion to appear pro hac vice #2 is granted. Attorney Matthew D. Schultz is added as counsel for plaintiff. Mailed notice (ags)
April 20, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc, Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX INC., Optum, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (smb, )
April 19, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lake County, Illinois by William F. Cash, III (Cash, William)
April 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20551866. (Schultz, Matthew)
April 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lake County, Illinois; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20550110. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cash, William)
April 18, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, )
April 18, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake County, Illinois v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake County, Illinois
Represented By: William F. Cash, III
Represented By: Benjamin Jacobs Widlanski
Represented By: Daniel Thomas DiClemente
Represented By: Tal J Lifshitz
Represented By: Steven J Daroci
Represented By: Rachel Sullivan
Represented By: Brandon L. Bogle
Represented By: Javier Asis Lopez
Represented By: Jorge Luis Piedra
Represented By: Matthew D. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Jason Adam Feld
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: Andrew A. Kassof
Represented By: Ryan Moorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. (FORMERLY EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMRX INC.
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Lucas Thor Rael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evernorth Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?