Chen et al v. Chojnacki et al
Plaintiff: Rick Chen, Thomas Lau, Tony Lau and Harry Tang
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki, Laurena Mikosz, Kendall Murphy, 1st Midwest Financial, Inc., EJ Investment Group, Inc., First National Financial Inc., Kathleen Long, Rachel Irwin, Chase Real Estate, LLC and FNBO Property Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv02520
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint Discovery Plan by Rick Chen (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 6/30/2023; Response due by 8/4/2023; Reply due by 8/18/2023. Status hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Virginia M. Kendall is presiding over 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, and the Hon. Jeffrey T. Gilbert as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Kendall shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Gilbert shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. 23 CV 1469 Shankar, et al. v. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC et al; 23 CV 1569 Haynes v. Fairview Avenue Properties, LLC et al; 23 CV 1691 Abbas v. Mikosz et al; 23 CV 2401 Sor v. TCF National Holdings, Inc. et al; 23 CV 2520 Chen et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2546 Michel et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2858 Said et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 3173 Stafford v. Chojnacki et al. Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/2023. Mailed notice (td, )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rick Chen as to Kathleen Long on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kathleen Long (smb, )
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marcin Chojnacki by Robert T. Boylan (Boylan, Robert)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marcin Chojnacki by Eric Joseph Shukis (Shukis, Eric)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 6/29/23 at 9:15 a.m. Dial: 888-684-8852 or 215-446-0155, access code: 9582710#. Joint status report shall be filed by 6/20/23. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (maf)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chase Real Estate, LLC (Koechley, Johnathon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Johnathon Christian Koechley (Koechley, Johnathon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (Henderson, Matthew)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rick Chen. Chase Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by Michael Richard Spanel (Spanel, Michael)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rachel Irwin by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rick Chen. Rachel Irwin waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Tony Lau, Thomas Lau, Rick Chen, Harry Tang; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20565345. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rick Chen, Thomas Lau, Tony Lau, Harry Tang by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rick Chen, Thomas Lau, Tony Lau, Harry Tang by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen et al v. Chojnacki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Chen
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lau
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Lau
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Tang
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurena Mikosz
Represented By: Michael R. Spanel
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Midwest Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ Investment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Irwin
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Henderson
Represented By: Johnathon Christian Koechley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNBO Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?