Michel et al v. Chojnacki et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Michel and Stephane Verdier
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki, Laurena Mikosz, Kathleen Long, Rachel Irwin, Page Street Properties LLC, Kendall Murphy, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC, Citypoint Illinois LLC, Main Street Property Management LLC, Chase Real Estate, LLC, Mon Ami TCF LLC, Fairview Avenue Properties LLC, TCF National Holdings, Inc. and Anand Sheth
Case Number: 1:2023cv02546
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint Discovery Plan by Thomas Michel, Stephane Verdier (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 6/30/2023; Response due by 8/4/2023; Reply due by 8/18/2023. Status hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Virginia M. Kendall is presiding over 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, and the Hon. Jeffrey T. Gilbert as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Kendall shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Gilbert shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. 23 CV 1469 Shankar, et al. v. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC et al; 23 CV 1569 Haynes v. Fairview Avenue Properties, LLC et al; 23 CV 1691 Abbas v. Mikosz et al; 23 CV 2401 Sor v. TCF National Holdings, Inc. et al; 23 CV 2520 Chen et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2546 Michel et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2858 Said et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 3173 Stafford v. Chojnacki et al. Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/2023. Mailed notice (td, )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Michel as to Kathleen Long on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rachel Irwin by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kathleen Long (smb, )
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chase Real Estate, LLC (Koechley, Johnathon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Johnathon Christian Koechley (Koechley, Johnathon)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (Henderson, Matthew)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Thomas Michel. Chase Real Estate, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Thomas Michel. Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Thomas Michel. Rachel Irwin waiver sent on 4/25/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motion to file document ECF No. 2-11 under seal #6 is granted. The document is sealed. Mailed notice (air, )
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Thomas Michel Redacted Exhibit 11 regarding complaint, #2 (Gaspero, Carmen)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Thomas Michel to seal document 2-11 (Gaspero, Carmen)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaspero, Carmen)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: #Local Rule 3.1# requires at the time of filing a case, plaintiff's counsel, or if the case is filed pro se, the plaintiff shall file with the original papers a completed designation sheet (civil cover sheet). No civil cover sheet was submitted at the time of filing this matter. Thomas Michel and Stephane Verdier are directed to file the #Civil Cover Sheet# within 14 days of this notification. Signed by the Executive Committee. (lm, )
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Thomas Michel, Stephane Verdier by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Stephane Verdier, Thomas Michel; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20569151. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Thomas Michel, Stephane Verdier by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, )
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michel et al v. Chojnacki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Michel
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephane Verdier
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurena Mikosz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Irwin
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page Street Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ Investment Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citypoint Illinois LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Property Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Johnathon Christian Koechley
Represented By: Matthew R. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mon Ami TCF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairview Avenue Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF National Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Sheth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?