Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago and CITY OF CHICAGO
Case Number: 1:2023cv02558
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Response to motion to remand #28 due 6/29/23. Reply due 7/20/23. The court will rule by mail. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Steven)
May 25, 2023 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limit #26 is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file memorandum of up to 25 pages. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 24, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America for leave to file excess pages (Johnson, Steven)
May 17, 2023 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Video status hearing held. Counsel for all parties appeared via video conference. Plaintiff reported on the status of this case. Motion to remand due 6/1/23. Responsive pleadings are stayed until a ruling is issued on the motion to remand. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 12, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Video status set for 5/17/23 at 11:00AM. Counsel of record will receive an email with a link to join the video conference prior to the hearing. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 650-479-3207 and the call-in ID is 1801732451. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (dm, )
May 10, 2023 Filing 23 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings pursuant to 40.3(b)(2). Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/10/2023. (jn, )
May 9, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 5/9/2023. There being no objections from plaintiff, Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago's motion to reassign under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) #15 is granted. The Clerk's Office will reassign the case to the calendar of Judge Rowland. Mailed notice. (ym,)
May 8, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant City of Chicago's motion for extension of time #20 is granted. Responsive to be filed by 6/16/2023. Presentment of Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago's motion to reassign under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) #15 set for 5/9/2023 at 10:00 AM will proceed as an in-person hearing in courtroom 1241. Mailed notice. (ym,)
May 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer (Duco, Matthew)
May 8, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by James Leo McKnight (McKnight, James)
May 5, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Matthew Joseph Duco (Duco, Matthew)
May 3, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago's unopposed motion for extension of time #13 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 6/16/2023. Mailed notice. (ym,)
May 3, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Susan T. Morakalis for presentment of motion to reassign case #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/9/2023 at 10:00 AM. (Morakalis, Susan)
May 3, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago to reassign case Under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) (Morakalis, Susan)
May 3, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Susan T. Morakalis for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 5/9/2023 at 10:00 AM. (Morakalis, Susan)
May 3, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago for extension of time (Morakalis, Susan)
May 3, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Bart Zimmer (Zimmer, Bart)
May 3, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Stacy K Shelly (Shelly, Stacy)
May 3, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Margaret Mary Molloy (Molloy, Margaret)
May 3, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Steven R. Johnson (Johnson, Steven)
May 2, 2023 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jj, )
May 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jj, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago by J. Mark Powell (Powell, J.)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago by Emily C Zapotocny (Zapotocny, Emily)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago by Anastasios T. Foukas (Foukas, Anastasios)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago by Jorge Tom Mihalopoulos (Mihalopoulos, Jorge)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago by Susan T. Morakalis (Morakalis, Susan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morakalis, Susan)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, County Department, Law Division, case number (2023 L 002551) filed by Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20590871. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Travelers State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Summons to MWRD in State Court, #3 Exhibit Group Ex 3 - All Other State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - 3 FR 2139-2140, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Executed Declaration of Ed Staudacher, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Travelers removal indicating its citizenship, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Executed Consent of City to Remove)(Morakalis, Susan)
May 1, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Bart Zimmer
Represented By: Margaret Mary Molloy
Represented By: Stacy K Shelly
Represented By: Steven R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago
Represented By: J. Mark Powell
Represented By: Emily C Zapotocny
Represented By: Anastasios T. Foukas
Represented By: Jorge Tom Mihalopoulos
Represented By: Susan T. Morakalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Duco
Represented By: James Leo McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?