McLaughlin v. Opichi, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joann McLaughlin
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Opichi, LLC doing business as Evergreen Services, LDF Holdings, LLC, Jessi Phillips Lorenzo, Jessi Lee Phillips, Rivo Holdings, LLC, Velocity Ventures Group, LLC doing business as Infinity Enterprise Lending Systems, Mark Koetting, Dan Koetting and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv02709
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 24 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice(gel, )
October 11, 2023 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #22 , this case is dismissed with prejudice as to the Plaintiff's individual claims against Defendants and without prejudice as to the putative class claims. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 10, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joann McLaughlin (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court has reviewed the parties 9/29/23 status report #20 and orders the parties to file dismissal documents or an updated status report by 10/27/23. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 29, 2023 Filing 20 STATUS Report by Joann McLaughlin (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 4, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the parties' notice of settlement #18 , the Court strikes all set dates and deadlines, including Defendants' 8/21/23 responsive pleading deadline. The parties shall file dismissal documents or an updated status report by 9/29/23. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 2, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Settlement and Request to Stay Deadlines by Joann McLaughlin (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 21, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer #16 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 8/21/2023. Counsel is reminded that all motions shall be noticed for presentment or may be stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 20, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Dan Koetting, Mark Koetting, LDF Holdings, LLC, Opichi, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Rivo Holdings, LLC, Velocity Ventures Group, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Lamer, Bryant)
July 7, 2023 Filing 15 STATUS Report (Initial Status Report) by Joann McLaughlin (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joann McLaughlin. LDF Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joann McLaughlin. Opichi, LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 5, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Dan Koetting on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 26, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo on 5/20/2023, answer due 6/12/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Mark Koetting on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/29/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 9, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Rivo Holdings, LLC on 5/5/2023, answer due 5/26/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 5, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Velocity Ventures Group, LLC on 5/3/2023, answer due 5/24/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 3, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report by 7/7/23, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at Gloria_Lewis@ilnd.uscourts.gov. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (mjc, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Joann McLaughlin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20590150. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(Edelman, Daniel)
May 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, )
May 1, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Dan Koetting, Mark Koetting, LDF Holdings, LLC, Opichi, LLC, Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo, Rivo Holdings, LLC, Velocity Ventures Group, LLC (jb, )
May 1, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin v. Opichi, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips Lorenzo
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opichi, LLC doing business as Evergreen Services
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDF Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Phillips Lorenzo
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lee Phillips
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivo Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Ventures Group, LLC doing business as Infinity Enterprise Lending Systems
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Koetting
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Koetting
Represented By: Bryant Todd Lamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann McLaughlin
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?