City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan v. Young et al
Plaintiff: City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan
Defendant: John F. Young, Anthony K. Anderson, Linda Jojo, Ann C. Berzin, Paul L. Joskow, Mayo A. Shattuck III, Laurie Brlas, Yves C. De Balmann, Robert J. Lawless, Nicholas Debenedictis, Stephen D. Steinour, Richard W. Mies, John W. Rogers, Jr., Christopher M. Crane, Joseph Dominguez, Anne Pramaggiore, Frank M. Clark, Thomas O'Neill, Fidel Marquez, John Hooker, Michael J. Madigan, Michael F. McClain, Jay Doherty, Edward Moody, Juan Ochoa, Victor Reyes, Reyes Kurson Ltd. and Exelon Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv02712
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2023 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: As this case has been reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey #59 , the 7/12/2023 status hearing set before this Court is stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
June 8, 2023 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Any docket entries shall be made in case number 21 CV 3611. No further entries shall be made on this docket. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Plaintiffs in Dybas, et al. v. Crane, et al., No. 23-cv-3318, a case currently assigned to Judge Valderrama, move to reassign their case to this Court as a related case. The parties here do not oppose the motion. Local Rule 40.4 instructs that case are related if they involve the same property, involve some of the same issues, grow out of the same transaction or occurrence, or, in class actions suits, one or more of the classes are the same. As with the two prior cases consolidated here, see #50 , the Dybas case similarly meets the Rule's criteria: the underlying allegations and claims asserted are substantially similar, involve substantially similar issues of fact and law and common defendants, and are predicated on the same or substantially similar transactions or occurrences. Reassignment is thus proper under the rule if: the cases are pending in this Court (they are); having a single judge handle the cases saves substantial judicial time and effort (it will); this case has not progressed to the point where reassignment will delay these proceedings (it has not); and the cases are susceptible to disposition in a single proceeding (they are indeed, the Special Litigation Committee's notice of determination and intent to seek court approval of settlement, #54 , discusses the Dybas case along with the Clem, Nicosia, and Coral Springs actions). Therefore, this Court, with the consent of Judge Valderrama, grants the motion for reassignment #55 and hereby refers the Dybas action (No. 23-cv-3318) to the Executive Committee for reassignment under L.R. 40.4 so that all four actions may be consolidated here. The Court grants the Special Litigation Committee's unopposed motion to consolidate #61 (docket entry #47 in Case No. 23-cv-02712; and docket entry #52 in Case No. 23-cv-02605) and consolidates all four cases (Clem; Nicosia v. Young, et al., No. 1:23-cv-02605; City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan v. Young, et al., No. 1:23-cv-02712; and Dybas v. Crane, No. 1:23-cv-03318) for all purposes under the name "In re Exelon Corporation Derivative Litigation." The Clerk shall consolidate the matters and amend the docket to reflect the name of the consolidated action. The Court grants the motions for leave to appear pro hac vice filed by David N. Kelley #53 and Melinda A. Nicholson (docket entry #15 in Case No. 23-cv-3318), and grants the motions to extend time filed by various Defendants in the different cases, including the motions filed by John Hooker (which appears at #57 here and at docket entry #55 in Case No. 23-cv-02712 and docket entry #61 in Case No. 23-cv-02605); Juan Ochoa (docket entries #49 in Case No. 23-cv-02712); Edward Moody (docket entry #52 in Case No. 23-cv-02712 and docket entry #58 in Case No. 23-cv-02605); Victor Reyes and Reye Kurson, Ltd. (docket entry #58 in Case No. 23-cv-02712 and docket entry 65 in Case No. 23-cv-02605); and Michael McClain (docket entry #30 in Case No. 23-cv-2605). Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 7/17/23. The 6/7/23 Notice of Motion date is stricken as to all motions. Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/6/2023. Mailed notice. (exr, )
June 5, 2023 Filing 58 MOTION by Defendants Victor Reyes, Reyes Kurson Ltd. for extension of time (Tighe, Joseph)
June 5, 2023 Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Reyes Kurson Ltd. by Joseph E. Tighe (Tighe, Joseph)
June 5, 2023 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Victor Reyes by Joseph E. Tighe (Tighe, Joseph)
June 2, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION by Defendant John Hooker for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Spevack, Barry)
June 2, 2023 Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anne Pramaggiore by David Andrew Gordon (Gordon, David)
June 2, 2023 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Anne Pramaggiore by Heather Benzmiller Sultanian (Sultanian, Heather)
June 1, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION by Defendant Edward Moody for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion (Pruitt, Eric)
June 1, 2023 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on Michael F. McClain on May 10, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
June 1, 2023 Filing 50 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Edward Moody by Eric S Pruitt (Pruitt, Eric)
June 1, 2023 Filing 49 MOTION by Defendant Juan Ochoa for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed Motion) (Meza, Ricardo)
May 31, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Motion by Joni S. Jacobsen for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #47 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/7/2023 at 11:00 AM. (Jacobsen, Joni)
May 31, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION by Unknown Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Exelon Corporation to consolidate cases (Jacobsen, Joni)
May 31, 2023 Filing 46 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Exelon Corporation by Joni S. Jacobsen (Jacobsen, Joni)
May 31, 2023 Filing 45 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Special Litigation Committee of the Board of Exelon Corporation by David H. Kistenbroker (Kistenbroker, David)
May 31, 2023 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Yves C. De Balmann waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Thomas O'Neill waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Stephen D. Steinour waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Richard W. Mies waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Robert J. Lawless waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Paul L. Joskow waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Nicholas Debenedictis waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Mayo A. Shattuck III waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Linda Jojo waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Laurie Brlas waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. John F. Young waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. John W. Rogers, Jr waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Joseph Dominguez waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Frank M. Clark waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Exelon Corporation waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Christopher M. Crane waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Ann C. Berzin waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Anthony K. Anderson waiver sent on 5/12/2023, answer due 7/11/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 31, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Thadford A. Felton for presentment of extension of time #25 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/7/2023 at 11:00 AM. (Felton, Thadford)
May 31, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Michael F. McClain for extension of time to Respond to the Complaint (Felton, Thadford)
May 31, 2023 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael F. McClain by David P. Niemeier (Niemeier, David)
May 31, 2023 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael F. McClain by Thadford A. Felton (Felton, Thadford)
May 31, 2023 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Michael J. Madigan waiver sent on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 30, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Hooker by Michael D. Monico (Monico, Michael)
May 30, 2023 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Hooker by Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson (Jacobson, Jacqueline)
May 30, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Hooker by Barry A. Spevack (Spevack, Barry)
May 26, 2023 Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John F. Kness no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/26/2023. (exr, )
May 25, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on Victor Reyes on May 15, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 25, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on Reyes Kurson, Ltd. on May 10, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 25, 2023 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on Juan Ochoa on May 11, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 25, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on Edward Moody on May 11, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 25, 2023 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on John Hooker on May 11, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 25, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan regarding Complaint and summons served on Jay Doherty on May 11, 2023 (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 23, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan. Anne Pramaggiore waiver sent on 5/18/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 18, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Juan Ochoa by John Karlos Lechuga (Lechuga, John)
May 15, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Juan Ochoa by Ricardo Meza (Meza, Ricardo)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 5/9/2023: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 7/12/2023 at 9:00 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, )
May 2, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan by Elena N Liveris (Liveris, Elena)
May 2, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan by Michael M. Mulder (Mulder, Michael)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan by Geoffrey M Johnson (Johnson, Geoffrey)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan by Joseph Allan Pettigrew (Pettigrew, Joseph)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan by Jing-Li Yu (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Yu, Jing-Li)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20591191.(Yu, Jing-Li)
May 1, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, )
May 1, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Anthony K. Anderson, Ann C. Berzin, Laurie Brlas, Frank M. Clark, Christopher M. Crane, Yves C. De Balmann, Nicholas Debenedictis, Jay Doherty, Joseph Dominguez, Exelon Corporation, John Hooker, Linda Jojo, Paul L. Joskow, Robert J. Lawless, Michael J. Madigan, Fidel Marquez, Michael F. McClain, Richard W. Mies, Edward Moody, Thomas O'Neill, Juan Ochoa, Anne Pramaggiore, Victor Reyes, Reyes Kurson Ltd., John W. Rogers, Jr, Mayo A. Shattuck III, Stephen D. Steinour, John F. Young (lm, )
May 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Coral Springs Police Officers' Pension Plan
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Allan Pettigrew
Represented By: Jing-Li Yu
Represented By: Elena N Liveris
Represented By: Michael M. Mulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Jojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann C. Berzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul L. Joskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo A. Shattuck III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Brlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves C. De Balmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Debenedictis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Steinour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Mies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Rogers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Pramaggiore
Represented By: Heather Benzmiller Sultanian
Represented By: David Andrew Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank M. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hooker
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. McClain
Represented By: Thadford A. Felton
Represented By: David P. Niemeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Moody
Represented By: Eric S Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Ochoa
Represented By: Ricardo Meza
Represented By: John K Lechuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Reyes
Represented By: Joseph E. Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes Kurson Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph E. Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?