Harris v. WLCC Lending FHC et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Harris
Defendant: Raycen Raines, III, WLCC Lending FHC doing business as Fox Hills Cash, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation, Geneva Lone Hill, Bret A Crandall, III, Raycen American Horse Raines, Raycen Ballard and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv03149
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Filing 17 STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by Joshua Harris (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 30, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Bret A Crandall, III's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 7/26/2023. No appearance necessary on 7/11/2023. Mailed notice. (ym,)
June 30, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Harris. Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation waiver sent on 6/9/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 30, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Harris. Geneva Lone Hill waiver sent on 6/9/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 30, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Harris. Raycen Raines, III waiver sent on 6/9/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 30, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Harris. WLCC Lending FHC waiver sent on 6/9/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 21, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Punit Kumar Marwaha for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM. (Marwaha, Punit)
June 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Bret A Crandall, III for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Marwaha, Punit)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bret A Crandall, III by Punit Kumar Marwaha (Marwaha, Punit)
June 9, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Harris as to Bret A Crandall, III on 6/5/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 22, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 7/18/2023 at 9:45 AM as an in-person hearing. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym,)
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
May 19, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Harris by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
May 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
May 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Joshua Harris; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20655469. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edelman, Daniel)
May 19, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (khg, )
May 19, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, )
May 19, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Bret A Crandall, III, Geneva Lone Hill, Raycen Raines, III, WLCC Lending FHC, Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. WLCC Lending FHC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen Raines, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLCC Lending FHC doing business as Fox Hills Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakpamni Lake Community Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geneva Lone Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret A Crandall, III
Represented By: Punit Kumar Marwaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen American Horse Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raycen Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Harris
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?