Stafford v. Chojnacki et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stafford
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki, Laurena Mikosz, Harlem Elmwood LLC, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Rachel Irwin, Robert Rixer, Chase Real Estate, LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Mainstreet Property Management LLC and Citypoint Illinois LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03173
Filed: May 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendal. Defendants' Motions to Join #29 , #26 and #28 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Kenneth Stafford (Gaspero, Lisa)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION by Defendants Rachel Irwin, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC to join Chase Real Estate's Motion to Dismiss (Katz, Jefferey)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant Laurena Mikosz to join Chase Real Estate LLC Motion to Dismiss (Oberts, William)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Harlem Elmwood LLC Count VII (Shukis, Eric)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Defendants Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Harlem Elmwood LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Robert Rixer to join Chase's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 24) (Shukis, Eric)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Chase Real Estate, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #24 (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC (DEFENDANT CHASE REAL ESTATE, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)) (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chase Real Estate, LLC and Disclosure Statement (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Johnathon Christian Koechley (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate, LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (Henderson, Matthew)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Harlem Elmwood LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Mainstreet Property Management LLC by Robert T. Boylan (Boylan, Robert)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Harlem Elmwood LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Mainstreet Property Management LLC by Eric Joseph Shukis (Shukis, Eric)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by Michael R. Spanel (Spanel, Michael)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint Discovery Plan by Kenneth Stafford (Gaspero, Lisa)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 6/30/2023; Response due by 8/4/2023; Reply due by 8/18/2023. Status hearing set for 9/28/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Virginia M. Kendall is presiding over 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, and the Hon. Jeffrey T. Gilbert as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 23 CV 1182, Malik et al v. Prairie Raynor LLC et al, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Kendall shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Gilbert shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. 23 CV 1469 Shankar, et al. v. Fairview Avenue Properties LLC et al; 23 CV 1569 Haynes v. Fairview Avenue Properties, LLC et al; 23 CV 1691 Abbas v. Mikosz et al; 23 CV 2401 Sor v. TCF National Holdings, Inc. et al; 23 CV 2520 Chen et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2546 Michel et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 2858 Said et al v. Chojnacki et al; 23 CV 3173 Stafford v. Chojnacki et al. Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/2023. Mailed notice (td, )
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kenneth Stafford. Robert Rixer waiver sent on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kenneth Stafford. Marcin Chojnacki waiver sent on 5/24/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Robert Rixer by Robert T. Boylan (Boylan, Robert)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marcin Chojnacki by Robert T. Boylan (Boylan, Robert)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Robert Rixer by Eric Joseph Shukis (Shukis, Eric)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marcin Chojnacki by Eric Joseph Shukis (Shukis, Eric)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 7/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, )
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rachel Irwin by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcc, )
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, )
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Stafford by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Stafford by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Stafford; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20657579. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford v. Chojnacki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stafford
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurena Mikosz
Represented By: Michael R. Spanel
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlem Elmwood LLC
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Irwin
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rixer
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Johnathon Christian Koechley
Represented By: Matthew R. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Assets LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Property Management LLC
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citypoint Illinois LLC
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?