Hui v. Chojnacki et al
Plaintiff: Randy Hui
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki, Laurena Mikosz, Grand Columbus EC LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, 1st Midwest Financial, Inc., Robert Rixer, Kendall Murphy, Chase Real Estate LLC, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC, Mainstreet Property Management, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Rachel Irwin and Citypoint Illinois LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03430
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Randy Hui (Gaspero, Lisa)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: Motions to join ( #32 , #33 , #34 , and #35 ) in the motion to dismiss are granted. Mailed notice (ags)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION by Defendants Rachel Irwin, Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC to join Chase Real Estate's Motion to Dismiss (Katz, Jefferey)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION by Defendant Laurena Mikosz to join Chase Real Estate LLC Motion to Dismiss (Oberts, William)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION by Defendants 1st Midwest Financial, Inc., Kendall Murphy to join Chase's Motion to Dismiss (Sriratana, Artapong)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Defendants Marcin Chojnacki, Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Grand Columbus EC LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Mainstreet Property Management, Robert Rixer to join Chase's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 30) (Shukis, Eric)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Chase Real Estate LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #30 (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Chase Real Estate LLC (DEFENDANT CHASE REAL ESTATE, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6)) (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chase Real Estate LLC and Disclosure Statement (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate LLC by Johnathon Christian Koechley (Koechley, Johnathon)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chase Real Estate LLC by Matthew R. Henderson (Henderson, Matthew)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kendall Murphy by Artapong Sriratana (Sriratana, Artapong)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 1st Midwest Financial, Inc. by Artapong Sriratana (Sriratana, Artapong)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by Michael R. Spanel (Spanel, Michael)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Laurena Mikosz by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John Robert Blakey no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/23. (aee, )
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 1st Midwest Financial, Inc. (Sadic, Michael)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Kendall Murphy waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. 1st Midwest Financial, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Lisa)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kendall Murphy by Michael Sadic (Sadic, Michael)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 1st Midwest Financial, Inc. by Michael Sadic (Sadic, Michael)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marcin Chojnacki, Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Grand Columbus EC LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Mainstreet Property Management, Robert Rixer by Robert T. Boylan (Boylan, Robert)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marcin Chojnacki, Citypoint Illinois LLC, EJ Investment Group, Inc., Grand Columbus EC LLC, Illinois Assets LLC, Mainstreet Property Management, Robert Rixer by Eric Joseph Shukis (Shukis, Eric)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Citypoint Illinois LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. EJ Investment Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Grand Columbus EC LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Illinois Assets LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Mainstreet Property Management waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Robert Rixer waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Randy Hui. Marcin Chojnacki waiver sent on 6/22/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Gaspero, Carmen)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rachel Irwin by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC by Jefferey Ogden Katz (Katz, Jefferey)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 7/17/2023, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at gloria_lewis@ilnd.uscourts.gov. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy Hui by Carmen Anthony Gaspero (Gaspero, Carmen)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Randy Hui by Lisa Marie Gaspero (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaspero, Lisa)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Randy Hui; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20691107. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Gaspero, Lisa)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcc, )
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hui v. Chojnacki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Hui
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Gaspero
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gaspero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcin Chojnacki
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurena Mikosz
Represented By: Michael R. Spanel
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Columbus EC LLC
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Assets LLC
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Midwest Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Artapong Sriratana
Represented By: Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rixer
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Murphy
Represented By: Artapong Sriratana
Represented By: Michael Sadic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Matthew R. Henderson
Represented By: Johnathon Christian Koechley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Title and Closing Services LLC
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Property Management
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJ Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Irwin
Represented By: Jefferey Ogden Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citypoint Illinois LLC
Represented By: Eric Joseph Shukis
Represented By: Robert T. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?