Fahy et al v. Minto Development Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Justin Fahy, Jennene Stoicescu, Kimberly Adams and William Northcutt
Defendant: Minto Development Corporation, Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Financial doing business as Minto Money and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv03590
Filed: June 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial to reset 08/28/2023 Reset Deadlines for the Joint Status Report and Initial Status Hearing (Zielinski, Sarah)
July 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: By no later than 8/7/2023, the parties (or, if no defendant has yet appeared, the plaintiff(s)) are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 on 8/14/2023 at 9:00 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to any defendant that has not yet appeared by counsel via regular mail at the address at which the defendant has been or is to be served with process. (mk)
July 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time #14 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 8/24/2023. (mk)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Agreed Second Motion (Zielinski, Sarah)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time #12 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 7/27/2023. (mk)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Agreed Motion (Zielinski, Sarah)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Zielinski, Sarah)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial by Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert (Gilbert, Amy)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial by Sarah Ann Zielinski (Zielinski, Sarah)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Adams, Jennene Stoicescu, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt as to Minto Development Corporation on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Adams, Jennene Stoicescu, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt as to Douglas William Isaacson on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Adams, Jennene Stoicescu, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt as to Benhti Economic Development Corporation on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Adams, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt, Jennene Stoicescu by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Adams, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt, Jennene Stoicescu by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kimberly Adams, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt, Jennene Stoicescu by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Kimberly Adams, Jennene Stoicescu, Justin Fahy, William Northcutt; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20712831. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Edelman, Daniel)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Benhti Economic Development Corporation, Douglas William Isaacson, Minto Development Corporation, Minto Financial (smb, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fahy et al v. Minto Development Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Fahy
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennene Stoicescu
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Adams
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Northcutt
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minto Development Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benhti Economic Development Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas William Isaacson
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minto Financial doing business as Minto Money
Represented By: Sarah Ann Zielinski
Represented By: Amy L. Starinieri Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?