Kean et al v. Carbon Solutions SREC LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Kean and Pamela Kean
Defendant: Carbon Solutions SREC LLC, Carbon Solutions Group, LLC, TruHome Pros, LLC, National Solar Service, LLC and Dividend Solar Finance LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv03767
Filed: June 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE by National Solar Service, LLC re answer to complaint #25 (Richmond, Scott)
August 8, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by National Solar Service, LLC(Richmond, Scott)
July 27, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 8/17/2023 at 10:40 a.m. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. COUNSEL MUST TYPE IN THEIR NAME WHEN JOINING THE CALL. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice. (kl, )
July 13, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Kean, Pamela Kean for Carbon Solutions SREC, LLC and Carbon Solutions Group, LLC Only (Edelman, Daniel)
July 12, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by TruHome Pros, LLC(Goldsworthy, Nicholas)
July 12, 2023 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TruHome Pros, LLC (Goldsworthy, Nicholas)
June 29, 2023 Filing 20 Appearance of Defendants Carbon Solutions SREC LLC and Carbon Solutions Group, LLC by Michael Kean, Pamela Kean (Edelman, Daniel)
June 29, 2023 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michael Kean, Pamela Kean. Carbon Solutions SREC LLC waiver sent on 6/16/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. (Edelman, Daniel)
June 28, 2023 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by National Solar Service, LLC (Richmond, Scott)
June 28, 2023 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Solar Service, LLC by Scott Gary Richmond (Richmond, Scott)
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TruHome Pros, LLC by James Arthur McGurk as local counsel (McGurk, James)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant TruHome Pros, LLC's motion for extension of time #14 is granted. Defendant TruHome Pros, LLC shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 7/12/23. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant TruHome Pros, LLC for extension of time Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Goldsworthy, Nicholas) Modified on 6/21/2023 (jk2, ).
June 20, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TruHome Pros, LLC by Nicholas J Goldsworthy (Goldsworthy, Nicholas)
June 20, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #10 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 16, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Michael Kean, Pamela Kean regarding Complaint served on Carbon Solutions Group LLC on 6/6/23 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edelman, Daniel)
June 16, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20745181. (Goldsworthy, Nicholas)
June 15, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Kean, Pamela Kean by Julia Ozello (Ozello, Julia)
June 15, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Kean, Pamela Kean by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
June 15, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Michael Kean, Pamela Kean by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
June 15, 2023 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jj, )
June 15, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Dividend Solar Finance LLC(Morrissey, Anna)
June 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jj, )
June 15, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Carbon Solutions SREC LLC (evw, )
June 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dividend Solar Finance LLC (Morrissey, Anna)
June 14, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morrissey, Anna)
June 14, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Dividend Solar Finance LLC by Anna S. Morrissey (Morrissey, Anna)
June 14, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2023CH04530) filed by Dividend Solar Finance LLC Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20737283. Complaint; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Affidavit of Service; Affidavit of Service; Summons; Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morrissey, Anna)
June 14, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kean et al v. Carbon Solutions SREC LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kean
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Julia Ozello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Kean
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Julia Ozello
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Solutions SREC LLC
Represented By: Edward David Shapiro
Represented By: Lorne T Saeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbon Solutions Group, LLC
Represented By: Edward David Shapiro
Represented By: Lorne T Saeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruHome Pros, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Goldsworthy
Represented By: James Arthur McGurk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Solar Service, LLC
Represented By: Scott Gary Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dividend Solar Finance LLC
Represented By: Anna S. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?