Shields v. Mondelez Global LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Shields, Daniel Berndt, Julio Perez, Augustyn Wiacek and Deidra Clay
Defendant: Mondelez Global LLC
Petitioner: Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
Intervenor: Eric D. Flores
Case Number: 1:2023cv03999
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Augustyn Wiacek by Raina C Borrelli (Borrelli, Raina)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consolidated AMENDED complaint by Michael Shields, Daniel Berndt, Julio Perez, Augustyn Wiacek, Deidra Clay against Mondelez Global LLC (Klinger, Gary)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mondelez Global LLC (Grinblat, Yan)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Joint Motion to adjourn status hearing #18 is granted. Motion and status hearing date of 8/16/23 are stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For Consolidation; (2)Granting Non-Party Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP's Motion For Leave And Motion For Reassignment And Denying Its Request For Consolidation; And (3) Granting Non-Party Eric D. Flores's Motion To Intervene. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/15/2023. Mailed notice(lf, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT NOTICE of Motion by Yan Grinblat for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #18 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/16/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Grinblat, Yan)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Mondelez Global LLC- Joint Motion To Adjourn Status Hearing - (Grinblat, Yan)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Michael Shields (Klinger, Gary)
July 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 27, 2023 before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Order Number: 46445. Court Reporter Contact Information: Annette Montalvo, annette.montalvo@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/21/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2023. (Montalvo, Annette)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion for consolidation of pending actions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and memorandum in support #2 is granted. Daniel Berndt v. Mondelez Global LLC, Case No. 1:23-cv-04001, and Augustyn Wiacek v. Mondelez Global LLC, Mondelez International Holdings LLC, Mondelez International, Inc., Case No. 1:23- cv-04023 will be reassigned to this Court and consolidated with this case under the caption "In re Mondelez Data Breach Litigation". Plaintiffs' Motion to appoint interim co-lead counsel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) and memorandum in support #3 is granted. Gary M. Klinger, A. Brooke Murphy, and Raina Borrelli are appointed as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Non-Party Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLp's Motion for leave to request reassignment and join motion to consolidate instanter #10 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted to the extent that it requests reassignment of the Flores case, and to the extent that it requests to join the motion to consolidate, but the request to consolidate is denied. Non-Party Eric D. Flores' Motion to intervene to object to non-party Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP's motion for leave to request reassignment and joint motion to consolidate instanter #13 is granted. Status hearing previously set for 8/16/23 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing set for 7/27/23 at 9:00 a.m. and 9/27/23 are stricken and reset to telephonic motion hearing on 7/27/23 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to intervene, #13 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/1/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Intervenor Eric D. Flores to intervene to Object to Non-Party Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP's Motion for Leave to Request Reassignment and Joint Motion to Consolidate Instanter (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: The parties' Joint Motion to extend Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to complaint #8 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond after the Court decides the Consolidation Motion, and specifically, 60 days: (1) after the decision if the Consolidation Motion is denied; or (2) after the filing of a consolidated amended complaint if the Consolidation Motion is granted. Motion hearing date of 7/26/23 is stricken. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by David Michael Friebus for presentment of motion for leave to file, #10 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/27/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Friebus, David)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Movant Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP for leave to file Request for Reassignment and to Join Motion to Consolidate Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Flores Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Berndt Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Wiacek Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Clay Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Notice)(Friebus, David)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Yan Grinblat for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/26/2023 at 09:30 AM. (Grinblat, Yan)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Mondelez Global LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Grinblat, Yan)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mondelez Global LLC by Yan Grinblat (Grinblat, Yan)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Gary M. Klinger for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #2 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/27/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation of Pending Actions Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 42(a)(2) and Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic status hearing set for 8/16/23 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 8/11/23. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, )
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Shields as to Mondelez Global LLC on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Klinger, Gary)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael ShieldsAppointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Klinger and Milberg Bio, #2 Exhibit 2- Murphy Bio, #3 Exhibit 3 - Turke & Strauss Bio, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael Shields to consolidate cases (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Mondelez Global LLC (smb, )
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Shields; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20765900. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klinger, Gary)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jcc, )
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Mondelez Global LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shields
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Berndt
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Perez
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustyn Wiacek
Represented By: Raina C Borrelli
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deidra Clay
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondelez Global LLC
Represented By: Yan Grinblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Eric D. Flores
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?