International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710 et al v. Ford et al
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamster Local 710, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority and International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710
Defendant: Robert B Ford, Hubert L. Allen, Robert J. Alpern, Roxanne S. Austin, Claire Babineaux-Fontenot, Sally E. Blount, Paola Gonzalez, Michelle A. Kumbier, Edward M. Liddy, Darren W. McDew, Nancy McKinstry, William A. Osborn, Michael F. Roman, Daniel J. Starks, John G. Stratton, Glenn F. Tilton, Miles D. White, Erica Battaglia, Christopher J. Calamari, Robert E. Funck, Jr., Joseph Manning, Lori J. Randall, Daniel Salvadori and James E. Young
Case Number: 1:2023cv04143
Filed: June 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Steven J. Toll's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #19 is granted. Emailed notice (axc).
July 5, 2023 Filing 21 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/5/2023.(jh, )
July 5, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20799081. (Toll, Steven)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama on 6/30/2023. Emailed notice (axc).
June 30, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: For the reasons stated in the motion, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #5 is granted. Enter Order. The unredacted complaint #2 may remain under seal pending further order. Emailed notice (axc).
June 29, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 09/05/2023 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Emailed notice (axc).
June 29, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Richard A. Speirs's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 is granted. Emailed notice (axc).
June 29, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20785820. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710 Pension Fund and Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority (Speirs, Richard)
June 29, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Amy R. Miller's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Emailed notice (axc).
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710 by Jing-Li Yu (Yu, Jing-Li)
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710 by Joseph Allan Pettigrew (Pettigrew, Joseph)
June 28, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710 by Geoffrey M Johnson (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20782097. on behalf of International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local No. 710 Pension Fund and Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority (Amy, Miller)
June 28, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority by Joseph Allan Pettigrew (Pettigrew, Joseph)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority by Jing-Li Yu (Yu, Jing-Li)
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority by Geoffrey M Johnson (Johnson, Geoffrey)
June 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jb, )
June 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jb, )
June 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs International Brotherhood of Teamster Local 710, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority for leave to file Complaint Under Seal (Gilden, Carol)
June 27, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs International Brotherhood of Teamster Local 710, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority by Carol V Gilden (Gilden, Carol)
June 27, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gilden, Carol)
June 27, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs International Brotherhood of Teamster Local 710, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority COMPLAINT (Gilden, Carol)
June 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, International Brotherhood of Teamster Local 710; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20779717.(Gilden, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710 et al v. Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamster Local 710
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Represented By: Amy Rebecca Miller,
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Represented By: Jing-Li Yu
Represented By: Joseph Allan Pettigrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 710
Represented By: Jing-Li Yu
Represented By: Joseph Allan Pettigrew
Represented By: Geoffrey M Johnson
Represented By: Amy Rebecca Miller
Represented By: Richard A Speirs
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert L. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Alpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne S. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire Babineaux-Fontenot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally E. Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle A. Kumbier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Liddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren W. McDew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy McKinstry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael F. Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn F. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Battaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Funck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori J. Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Salvadori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?