Hall v. Big Picture Loans, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Hall
Defendant: Big Picture Loans, LLC, Matt Martorello, Eventide Credit Acquisitions, LLC, Liont, LLC and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv04502
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear their own costs and fees. Plaintiff dismisses the claims of the putative class without prejudice and with each party to bear their own costs and fees. Status hearing set for 9/13/2023 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym)
September 6, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew Hall (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Big Picture Loans, LLC by Jean M. Blanton (Blanton, Jean)
August 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Big Picture Loans, LLC (Korin, Offer)
August 4, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Big Picture Loans, LLC by Offer Korin (Korin, Offer)
July 26, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Hall. Big Picture Loans, LLC waiver sent on 7/18/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 21, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Hall. Matt Martorello waiver sent on 7/17/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 14, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 9/13/2023 at 9:45 AM as an in-person hearing. Plaintiff(s) is directed to advise the defendant(s) of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. If the parties agree to consent jurisdiction before the Magistrate Judge, all parties must sign the consent form and electronically file the signed form on the case docket. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym,)
July 13, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Big Picture Loans, LLC, Eventide Credit Acquisitions, LLC, Liont, LLC, Matt Martorello (emc, )
July 13, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (emc, )
July 13, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (emc, )
July 12, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
July 12, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
July 12, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
July 12, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Hall by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
July 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
July 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Matthew Hall; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20822946. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Big Picture Loans, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hall
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Picture Loans, LLC
Represented By: Jean M. Blanton
Represented By: Offer Korin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Martorello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eventide Credit Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liont, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?