O'Dekirk et al v. Roechner et al
Plaintiff: Robert O'Dekirk, Rebecca Marie and Mason Palacios
Defendant: Al Roechner, Marc Reid, Pat Mudron, Jim Mcfarland, Joseph Hosey, Shaw Media, Nancy Roechner and City of Joliet
Case Number: 1:2023cv04658
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Pat Mudron, Marc Reid in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #46 (Simandl, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Pat Mudron, Marc Reid (Simandl, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Jim Mcfarland (Schrock, John)
September 15, 2023 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Shaw Media in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #43 (Harris, Natalie)
September 15, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Shaw Media (Harris, Natalie)
September 15, 2023 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by Joseph Hosey in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #41 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Murphy, James)
September 15, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Joseph Hosey (Murphy, James)
September 15, 2023 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by City of Joliet in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #39 Defendant City of Joliet's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss (Mathues, Glenn)
September 15, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant City of Joliet Defendant City of Joliet's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Mathues, Glenn)
August 30, 2023 Filing 38 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Shaw Media (Harris, Natalie)
August 28, 2023 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendants, Al Roechner and Nancy Griparis's unopposed motion for extension on defendants' deadline to respond to the complaint #36 is granted. Defendants Roechner and Griparis to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/27/2023. (rao, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendants Al Roechner, Nancy Roechner for extension of time Unopposed Motion for Extension on Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint (Watkins, Danessa)
August 28, 2023 Filing 35 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Al Roechner, Nancy Roechner by Danessa P. Watkins Appearance for Al Roechner and Nancy Griparis incorrectly sued as Nancy Roechner (Watkins, Danessa)
August 28, 2023 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Al Roechner, Nancy Roechner by Ryan Brandon Jacobson Appearance for Al Roechner and Nancy Griparis incorrectly sued as Nancy Roechner (Jacobson, Ryan)
August 28, 2023 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant Shaw Suburban Media Group, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #30 is granted. Defendant Shaw Suburban Media Group to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/15/2023. (rao, )
August 25, 2023 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shaw Media by Natalie Anne Harris (Harris, Natalie)
August 25, 2023 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shaw Media by Brendan J. Healey (Healey, Brendan)
August 25, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendant Shaw Media for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Albrecht, Sharon)
August 25, 2023 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shaw Media by Sharon Renae Albrecht (Albrecht, Sharon)
August 24, 2023 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jim Mcfarland by John Vernon Schrock (Schrock, John)
August 18, 2023 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant Joseph Hosey's unopposed motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading #25 is granted. Defendant Hosey to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/15/2023. The initial status report filing date of 9/20/2023 stands. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, )
August 18, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Jim Mcfarland on 8/18/2023, answer due 9/8/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 18, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Joseph Hosey for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Murphy, James)
August 18, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant Marc Reid's unopposed motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading #23 is granted. Defendant Reid to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/15/2023. (rao, )
August 17, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Marc Reid for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading (Simandl, Daniel)
August 17, 2023 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marc Reid by Daniel Simandl (Simandl, Daniel)
August 17, 2023 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marc Reid by Michael Scott Ferrell (Ferrell, Michael)
August 17, 2023 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Joseph Hosey by James A. Murphy (Murphy, James)
August 17, 2023 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant Mudron's unopposed motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading #18 is granted. Defendant Patrick Mudron to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/15/2023. (rao, )
August 16, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Pat Mudron for extension of time Defendant Pat Mudron's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Simandl, Daniel)
August 16, 2023 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pat Mudron by Michael Scott Ferrell (Ferrell, Michael)
August 16, 2023 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pat Mudron by Daniel Simandl (Simandl, Daniel)
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk by Dennis Berkson (Berkson, Dennis)
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Pat Mudron on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Shaw Media on 8/4/2023, answer due 8/25/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Al Roechner on 8/9/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Nancy Roechner on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Marc Reid on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to City of Joliet on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk as to Joseph Hosey on 7/30/2023, answer due 8/21/2023. (Michael, Alexander)
August 14, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Joliet by Michael D. Bersani (Bersani, Michael)
August 14, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant City of Joliet's unopposed motion to extend deadline to file responsive pleading #5 is granted. Defendant City of Joliet to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiffs' complaint by 9/15/2023. The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 9/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, )
August 11, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant City of Joliet for extension of time Defendant City of Joliet's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Mathues, Glenn)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Joliet by Glenn David Mathues (Mathues, Glenn)
August 10, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robert O'Dekirk by Michael D. Ettinger (Ettinger, Michael)
July 21, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants City of Joliet, Joseph Hosey, Jim Mcfarland, Pat Mudron, Marc Reid, Al Roechner, Nancy Roechner, Shaw Media (smb, )
July 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Michael, Alexander)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mason Palacios, Rebecca Marie, Robert O'Dekirk; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20843846.(Michael, Alexander)
July 19, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )
July 19, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Dekirk et al v. Roechner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O'Dekirk
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: Dennis Berkson
Represented By: Michael D. Ettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Marie
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Represented By: Dennis Berkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Palacios
Represented By: Alexander Albert Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Roechner
Represented By: Ryan Brandon Jacobson
Represented By: Danessa P. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Reid
Represented By: Michael Scott Ferrell
Represented By: Daniel Simandl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Mudron
Represented By: Michael Scott Ferrell
Represented By: Daniel Simandl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Mcfarland
Represented By: John Vernon Schrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hosey
Represented By: James A. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Media
Represented By: Brendan J. Healey
Represented By: Natalie Anne Harris
Represented By: Sharon Renae Albrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Roechner
Represented By: Ryan Brandon Jacobson
Represented By: Danessa P. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Joliet
Represented By: Michael D. Bersani
Represented By: Glenn David Mathues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?