Capp Inc. et al v. Discover Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Capp Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc. and Prayus Group LLC
Defendant: Discovery Financial Services, DFS Services, LLC, Discovery Bank, Discover Financial Services and Discover Bank
Case Number: 1:2023cv04676
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services for extension of time to Respond to the Amended Complaint and Submit Joint Initial Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hletko, Valerie)
September 8, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Prayus Group LLC, Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiffs Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Prayus Group LLC, Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. to compel Rule 26(f) Conference #19 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel and Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Djordjevic, Nada)
September 8, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE by DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services to MOTION by Plaintiffs Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Prayus Group LLC, Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. to compel Rule 26(f) Conference #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hletko, Valerie)
September 7, 2023 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Catherine Pratsinakis regarding motion to compel #19 Rule 26(f) Conference (Djordjevic, Nada)
September 7, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM motion to compel #19 by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Prayus Group LLC, Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. (Djordjevic, Nada)
September 7, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Prayus Group LLC, Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. to compel Rule 26(f) Conference (Djordjevic, Nada)
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendants' motion for an extension of time (Dckt. No. #11 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiffs intend to file a first amended complaint. The Court grants Defendants leave to file a response to the first amended complaint within 45 days of filing. Mailed notice (jjr, )
August 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Prayus Group LLC (Djordjevic, Nada)
August 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Capp Inc. (Djordjevic, Nada)
August 11, 2023 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by KMJA Day Camps, Inc. (Djordjevic, Nada)
August 11, 2023 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. (Djordjevic, Nada)
August 11, 2023 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attached Redline of First Amended Complaint)(Djordjevic, Nada)
August 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Defendants (Porter, Julie)
August 11, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services for extension of time (Porter, Julie)
August 11, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services by Andrew James Soukup (Soukup, Andrew)
August 11, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services by Julie B. Porter (Porter, Julie)
August 11, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services by Valerie Lynn Hletko (Hletko, Valerie)
July 28, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. as to Discover Financial Services on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (Djordjevic, Nada)
July 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. as to DFS Services, LLC on 7/26/2023, answer due 8/16/2023. (Djordjevic, Nada)
July 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. as to Discover Bank on 7/21/2023, answer due 8/11/2023. (Djordjevic, Nada)
July 20, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc. by Nada Djordjevic (Djordjevic, Nada)
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by October 3, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
July 20, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants DFS Services, LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services (lm, )
July 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Djordjevic, Nada)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Capp Inc., KMJA Day Camps, Inc., Young Peoples Day Camps Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20845783.(Djordjevic, Nada)
July 19, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, )
July 19, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capp Inc. et al v. Discover Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capp Inc.
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Peoples Day Camps Inc.
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KMJA Day Camps, Inc.
Represented By: Nada Djordjevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prayus Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFS Services, LLC
Represented By: Valerie Lynn Hletko
Represented By: Andrew James Soukup
Represented By: Julie B. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Andrew James Soukup
Represented By: Julie B. Porter
Represented By: Valerie Lynn Hletko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Andrew James Soukup
Represented By: Valerie Lynn Hletko
Represented By: Julie B. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?