Williams et al v. Saint Anthony Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Mary Williams, Antwan Taylor, Sr and Antwan Taylor, Jr.
Defendant: Saint Anthony Hospital, Saint Anthony Hospital Foundation, Saint Anthony PHO, LLC, OBHG Illinois, S.C., Kara Greeley, M.D., Michele Bucciero, M.D. and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2023cv04733
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Status hearing set for 9/27/2023 is reset for 10/31/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michele Bucciero, MD, Saint Anthony Hospital by Lynsey Anne Stewart (Stewart, Lynsey)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michele Bucciero, MD, Saint Anthony Hospital by Richard Charles Huettel (Huettel, Richard)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The Government's Unopposed Motion for leave to file under seal #15 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 EXHIBIT by United States of America Exhibit A to Dkt. 13 REPLY by Defendant United States of America to motion to dismiss (Phillip, Danielle)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Danielle Anne Phillip for presentment of motion to seal document #15 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/22/2023 at 09:00 AM. (Phillip, Danielle)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant United States of America to seal document United States' Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibit A to Its Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss (Phillip, Danielle)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE by Defendant United States of America to memorandum, #12 Statement of Material Facts in Support of Response in Opposition to United States' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Phillip, Danielle)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY by Defendant United States of America to motion to dismiss #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Phillip, Danielle)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM response in opposition to motion, #11 by Antwan Taylor, Jr, Antwan Taylor, Sr, Mary Williams Statement of Material Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mary Williams, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Antwan Taylor, Sr., #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Charles C. Bletsas)(Weinstein, Lisa)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by Antwan Taylor, Jr, Antwan Taylor, Sr, Mary Williamsin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to dismiss #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mary Williams, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Antwan Taylor, Sr., #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Charles C. Bletsas, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service of Dr. Greeley)(Weinstein, Lisa)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antwan Taylor, Jr, Antwan Taylor, Sr, Mary Williams by Lisa B Weinstein (Weinstein, Lisa)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antwan Taylor, Jr, Antwan Taylor, Sr, Mary Williams by William F Moore (Moore, William)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antwan Taylor, Jr, Antwan Taylor, Sr, Mary Williams by Caitlin McNabb Doermer (Doermer, Caitlin)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Antwan Taylor, Jr, Antwan Taylor, Sr, Mary Williams by Charles C. Bletsas (Bletsas, Charles)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Motion to Dismiss #4 . Response due by 8/9/2023; Reply due by 8/16/2023. Status hearing set for 9/27/2023 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Charles C. Bletsas, Ethan Chase Guthman, and William F. Moore. (jh, )
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jh, )
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phillip, Danielle)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Danielle Anne Phillip as U.S. Attorney for Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Phillip, Danielle)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Phillip, Danielle)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2023-L-002462) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and Substitution of the United States as Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Phillip, Danielle)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Saint Anthony Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Williams
Represented By: Lisa B Weinstein
Represented By: Caitlin McNabb Doermer
Represented By: Charles C. Bletsas
Represented By: Ethan Chase Guthman
Represented By: William F. Moore
Represented By: William F Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Taylor, Sr
Represented By: Lisa B Weinstein
Represented By: Caitlin McNabb Doermer
Represented By: Charles C. Bletsas
Represented By: Ethan Chase Guthman
Represented By: William F Moore
Represented By: William F. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Lisa B Weinstein
Represented By: Caitlin McNabb Doermer
Represented By: Charles C. Bletsas
Represented By: Ethan Chase Guthman
Represented By: William F Moore
Represented By: William F. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Anthony Hospital
Represented By: Richard Charles Huettel
Represented By: Lynsey Anne Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Anthony Hospital Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Anthony PHO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBHG Illinois, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Greeley, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Bucciero, M.D.
Represented By: Richard Charles Huettel
Represented By: Lynsey Anne Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Danielle Anne Phillip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?