Stanford Health Care v. Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas et al
Plaintiff: Stanford Health Care
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas, Does 1 through 25 Inclusive and Health Care Service Corporation a Mutual Legal Reserve Co. doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois & Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Case Number: 1:2023cv04744
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: By request and agreement of the parties, as reflected in their status report #31 filed 9/11/2023, the parties' obligations to file a proposed discovery schedule, exchange initial disclosures, and conduct discovery are deferred until 14 days after the court rules on the pending motion to remand and any motion to dismiss the complaint. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Health Care Service Corporation (Kollmansberger, Taylor)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: The parties' joint motion #25 to stay defendant Health Care Service Corp.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is granted. Plaintiff's motion #26 to remand this case to the state court from which it was removed is briefed as follows (all dates inclusive): response due: 9/19/2023; reply due: 10/3/2023. The court will rule by mail on the motion to remand. By agreement of the parties, a deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint will be set, if necessary, with the court's ruling on the motion to remand. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Dusold, Kenneth)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stanford Health Care by Marcus Rockwell Morrow (Morrow, Marcus)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff is advised that no substantive action may be taken until all notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 have been filed. All notifications as to affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2 must be filed on or before 8/24/2023. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Stanford Health Care to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion for Remand)(Dusold, Kenneth)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Stanford Health CareJoint Motion for Stay of Responsive Pleadings Deadline (Dusold, Kenneth)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stanford Health Care by Kenneth John Dusold (Dusold, Kenneth)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant Health Care Service Corp.'s unopposed motion #22 under Local Rule 7.1 for leave to file a memorandum of law not to exceed 20 pages in support of its anticipated motion to dismiss the complaint is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation for leave to file excess pages DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TP FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES (Vaysman, Karen)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Amir Shlesinger's motion to appear pro hac vice #20 on behalf of the defendant Health Care Service Corporation is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-20926201. (Shlesinger, Amir)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: An initial status report is due on or before September 11, 2023. Counsel and parties are directed to familiarize themselves with the pretrial procedures in Judge Gottschall's case management packet, which is available from the court's website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Please pay particular attention to the requirement to exchange initial disclosures within 14 days of the parties' initial discovery planning conference and the court's requirement that the parties are to explore settlement opportunities and identify areas of agreement prior to the filing of the first status report. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C) and 26(f)(2). If, by the due date of the scheduled status report, defendants have not been served, plaintiff should send an email to the chambers email account, chambers_gottschall@ilnd.uscourts.gov, to reset the status date. Counsel in cases removed from another court should follow these procedures to the extent applicable. See the order and Judge Gottschall's case management packet for further details. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 7/26/2023. Mailed notice(mjc, )
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant's unopposed motion #15 for an extension to and including 8/28/2023 of its deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's first amended complaint is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (jn, )
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jn, )
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas re exhibit, #5 of Errata- Exhibit O-1 to the Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vaysman, Karen)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (Vaysman, Karen)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (evw, )
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Exhibit H-2 regarding exhibit, #5 , notice of removal, #1 , exhibit, #10 (Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) regarding exhibit, #5 , exhibit,, #11 , exhibit,, #8 , exhibit, #10 , exhibit,, #6 , exhibit, #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Claim 71, #2 Exhibit P-1 Claim 77, #3 Exhibit P-2 Claim 77, #4 Exhibit Q-1 Claim 78, #5 Exhibit Q-2 Claim 78, #6 Exhibit Q-3 Claim 78, #7 Exhibit R-1 Claim 89, #8 Exhibit R-2 Claim 89, #9 Exhibit R-3 Claim 78, #10 Exhibit R-4 Claim 78)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) regarding exhibit, #5 , exhibit,, #11 , exhibit,, #8 , notice of removal, #1 , exhibit, #10 , exhibit,, #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O-1 CLAIM 71)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) regarding exhibit, #5 , exhibit,, #8 , exhibit, #10 , exhibit,, #6 , notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-2 Claim No. 45, #2 Exhibit K-1 Claim No. 55, #3 Exhibit K-2 Claim No. 55, #4 Exhibit L- 2 Claim No. 61, #5 Exhibit L-2 Claim No. 61, #6 Exhibit M-1 Claim No. 66, #7 Exhibit M-2 Claim No. 66, #8 Exhibit N-1 Claim No. 67, #9 Exhibit N-2 Claim No. 67, #10 Exhibit O-Claim No. 71)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) regarding exhibit, #5 , exhibit,, #8 , exhibit,, #6 , notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H- 1 Part 4, #2 Exhibit H-3 Claim 43, #3 Exhibit I-1 Claim 44, #4 Exhibit I-2 Claim No. 44)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas by Taylor Kollmansberger (Kollmansberger, Taylor)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) regarding exhibit, #5 , exhibit,, #6 , notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - 2Claim No. 28 Part 1, #2 Exhibit E -3 Claim No.28 Part 3, #3 Exhibit F- 1 Claim No. 29, #4 Exhibit F-2 Claim No. 29, #5 Exhibit G-1 Claim No 39, #6 Exhibit G-2 Claim No. 39, #7 Exhibit G-3 Claim No. 39, #8 Exhibit H-1 Claim No. 43, #9 Exhibit H-1 Claim No. 43 Part 2)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas by Karen Eva Vaysman (Vaysman, Karen)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Declaration of Stacy Burns In Support of Notice of Removal regarding exhibit, #5 , notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1 Claim 2 Part 4, #2 Exhibit B-2 Claim No. 2, #3 Exhibit C-1 Claim No 19, #4 Exhibit C-2 Claim No.19, #5 Exhibit C-3 Claim No. 19, #6 Exhibit D-1 Claim No. 20, #7 Exhibit D-2 Claim No. 20)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXHIBIT by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Declaration of Stacy Burns in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) regarding notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Claim No. 1, #2 Exhibit A-2 Claim No.1, #3 Exhibit B-1 Claim No. 2 Part 1, #4 Exhibit B-1 Claim No. 2. Part 2)(Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas (Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas by Martin J. Bishop (Bishop, Martin)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2023L002009) filed by Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20855383. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Bishop, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanford Health Care v. Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Health Care
Represented By: Marcus Rockwell Morrow
Represented By: Kenneth John Dusold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois and d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Represented By: Karen Eva Vaysman
Represented By: Taylor Kollmansberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation a Mutual Legal Reserve Co. doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois & Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Martin J. Bishop
Represented By: Karen Eva Vaysman
Represented By: Amir Shlesinger
Represented By: Taylor Kollmansberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?