Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership
Defendant: John Eric Kodwo Taylor, Bertha Minyila Taylor, 2233 Edgebrooke Drive LLC and Unit 4001 Elysian Private Residences, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv05171
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Wafeek Mohamed Elafifi for presentment of motion for leave to file #30 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/4/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Elafifi, Wafeek)
September 28, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Wafeek Mohamed Elafifi for presentment of motion for leave to file #30 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/6/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Elafifi, Wafeek)
September 28, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership for leave to file to File First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit London Judgment)(Elafifi, Wafeek)
September 27, 2023 Filing 29 REPLY by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership to complaint, #1 in Support of Petition for Confirmation of Foreign Arbitral Award, or alternatively, Recognition of Foreign-Country Money Judgment (Elafifi, Wafeek)
September 27, 2023 Filing 28 REPLY by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership to response in opposition to motion #26 Preliminary Injunction (Elafifi, Wafeek)
September 21, 2023 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file excess pages #24 is granted, and no appearance on the motion is necessary. Plaintiff may use 15 pages for its reply brief. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 20, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE by John Eric Kodwo Taylorin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership for preliminary injunction #19 (Sterling, Hillard)
September 20, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Rowland Arthur Edwards for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #24 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/26/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Edwards, Rowland)
September 20, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership for leave to file excess pages (Edwards, Rowland)
September 13, 2023 Filing 23 Defendant John Eric Kodwo Taylor's Opposition to Plaintiff's Petition for Confirmation of A Foreign Arbitral Award or Alternatively, Recognition of a Foreign Money Judgment ANSWER to Complaint by John Eric Kodwo Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sterling, Hillard)
September 11, 2023 Filing 22 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by 2233 Edgebrooke Drive LLC, Bertha Minyila Taylor, John Eric Kodwo Taylor, Unit 4001 Elysian Private Residences, LLC(Sterling, Hillard)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/8/2023. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 25, 2023 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership in support of motion for preliminary injunction #19 (Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 25, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership for preliminary injunction (Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 22, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is due 8/25/23, defendants' response is due 9/20/23, and plaintiff's reply is due 9/27/23. Plaintiff's motion will replace its motion for a rule to show cause and TRO. The briefing schedule on the petition to confirm the arbitration award remains as set. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 21, 2023 Filing 17 STATUS Report for agreed briefing schedule by Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership (Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 17, 2023 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/17/2023, Motion Hearing, before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 46626. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen_Conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov or 312.435.5594. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/7/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2023. (Conway, Colleen)
August 17, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. Counsel for defendants appears in court. For the reasons stated in open court, the Motion for Ex Parte Order of Attachment and Temporary Restraining Order #10 is denied in part and entered and continued in part. The motion is denied as to the ex parte request, and denied as to the request for an immediate attachment order against the Walton Property. The motion is entered and continued as to the remainder of the requested injunctive relief. The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a status report by 8/21/23 with an agreed or competing proposals for briefing the motion and with any requests to modify the briefing schedule on the petition to confirm the arbitration award. Defendants are ordered to hold in escrow the net proceeds of the sale of the 11 E. Walton Street property, however the sale itself is not enjoined. Defendants are further ordered to freeze any assets in their accounts at Northern Trust and JPMorgan Chase, pending further order of this court. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 17, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 2233 Edgebrooke Drive LLC, Bertha Minyila Taylor, John Eric Kodwo Taylor, Unit 4001 Elysian Private Residences, LLC by Andrew Christopher Clott (Clott, Andrew)
August 17, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 2233 Edgebrooke Drive LLC, Bertha Minyila Taylor, John Eric Kodwo Taylor, Unit 4001 Elysian Private Residences, LLC by Hillard M. Sterling (Sterling, Hillard)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Wafeek M. Elafifi regarding motion for order to show cause,, #10 for Ex Parte Order of Attachment and Temporary Restraining Order (Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 15, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 2233 Edgebrooke Drive LLC, Bertha Minyila Taylor, John Eric Kodwo Taylor, Unit 4001 Elysian Private Residences, LLC (jxm, )
August 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Wafeek Mohamed Elafifi for presentment of motion for order to show cause,, #10 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/17/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 11, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership for order to show cause for Ex Parte Order of Attachment and Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wafeek M. Elafifi Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Show Cause, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Zadkovich Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Guarantee, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Arbitration Award, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Bermudian Judgment, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Adamson Declaration)(Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 10, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership by Rowland Arthur Edwards (Edwards, Rowland)
August 9, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Response to the Petition to Confirm a Foreign Arbitral Award or, in thealternative, to Recognize a Foreign Money Judgment #1 is due 9/13/23. Reply is due 9/27/23. The court will issue a ruling via cm/ecf. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 8, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership by Zachary Barger (Barger, Zachary)
August 8, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axa, )
August 8, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axa, )
August 7, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership by Wafeek Mohamed Elafifi (Elafifi, Wafeek)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM complaint, #1 by Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership supporting confirmation of foreign arbitral award or foreign money judgment (McGovern, Timothy)
August 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership (McGovern, Timothy)
August 4, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership by Timothy S McGovern (McGovern, Timothy)
August 4, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McGovern, Timothy)
August 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20901677. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(McGovern, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vantage Mezzanine Fund II Partnership
Represented By: Timothy S McGovern
Represented By: Zachary Barger
Represented By: Rowland Arthur Edwards
Represented By: Wafeek Mohamed Elafifi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eric Kodwo Taylor
Represented By: Hillard M. Sterling
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Clott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Minyila Taylor
Represented By: Hillard M. Sterling
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Clott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2233 Edgebrooke Drive LLC
Represented By: Hillard M. Sterling
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Clott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit 4001 Elysian Private Residences, LLC
Represented By: Hillard M. Sterling
Represented By: Andrew Christopher Clott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?