McLaughlin v. Rosebud Lending DRT et al
Plaintiff: Joann McLaughlin
Defendant: Rosebud Lending DRT, Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, LP, John Does 1-20 and Rosebud Lending DRT doing business as MyQuickWallet.com
Case Number: 1:2023cv05825
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Referring Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court reviewed the notice of settlement. (Dckt. No. #11 ) The parties have reached a settlement in principle, and expect to file a stipulation of dismissal within 60 days. Based on that representation, the complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The dismissal shall automatically convert to a dismissal with prejudice unless a party seeks and receives relief from the Court by November 30, 2023. The case is closed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Settlement & Request to Stay Deadlines by Joann McLaughlin (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 8, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joann McLaughlin. Rosebud Lending DRT waiver sent on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joann McLaughlin as to Princeton Alternative Income Fund, LP on 8/25/2023, answer due 9/15/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 23, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by November 6, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
August 23, 2023 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 294(b). Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/2023. (jg, )
August 22, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joann McLaughlin by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action (Filing Fee $402, Receipt Number AILNDC-20953950) filed by Joann McLaughlin ; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Edelman, Daniel)
August 22, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC, Princeton Alternative Income Fund, LP, Rosebud Lending DRT (smb, )
August 22, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (smb, )
August 22, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (smb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin v. Rosebud Lending DRT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann McLaughlin
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebud Lending DRT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Alternative Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Alternative Income Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosebud Lending DRT doing business as MyQuickWallet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?