Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. Connex Railroad LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters and Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Defendant: Connex Railroad LLC and Transdev North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv12853
Filed: September 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #15 ) is granted. Attorney James N. Foster, Jr. is added as counsel for Connex Railroad LLC and Transdev North America, Inc. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
October 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21221127. (Foster, James)
October 13, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Connex Railroad LLC, Transdev North America, Inc. by Michelle Marie Cain (Cain, Michelle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Transdev North America, Inc. (Respondent) (Cain, Michelle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Connex Railroad LLC (Respondent) (Cain, Michelle)
October 13, 2023 Filing 11 Respondents ANSWER to Complaint and Petition to Enforce Award and Order of the National Railroad Adjustment Board by Connex Railroad LLC, Transdev North America, Inc.(Cain, Michelle)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters as to Connex Railroad LLC on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (McGuire, Michael)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters as to Transdev North America, Inc. on 9/26/2023, answer due 10/17/2023. (McGuire, Michael)
September 22, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Connex Railroad LLC, Transdev North America, Inc. (mcp, )
September 21, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. Nos. #6 and #7 are granted. Attorney David O'Brien Suetholz and Rachel Rae Rekowski are added as counsel for plaintiff. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21108636. (Rekowski, Rachel)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21108334. (Suetholz, David)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (McGuire, Michael)
September 15, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by November 29, 2023. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (exr, )
September 15, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
September 14, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters by Michael J. McGuire Canty (McGuire, Michael)
September 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McGuire, Michael)
September 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Canty filed by Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21073807. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McGuire, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. Connex Railroad LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Federation Brotherhood of Maintenance Of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Rachel Rae Rekowski
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connex Railroad LLC
Represented By: James N Foster, Jr
Represented By: Michelle Marie Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transdev North America, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Marie Cain
Represented By: James N Foster, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?