Open Communities et al v. Harbor Group Management Co., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Open Communities and Elizabeth Richardson
Defendant: HARBOR GROUP MANAGEMENT CO., LLC, HARBOR GROUP INTERNATIONAL, LLC, AZURE PARTNERS, LLC, PERQ HOLDINGS, LLC, PERQ SOFTWARE, LLC, PERQ MARKETING, LLC, AZURE NORTHGATE LLC and SILVER NORTHGATE LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv14070
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Perq Holdings, LLC, Perq Marketing, LLC, Perq Software, LLC by Manuel Herceg (Herceg, Manuel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status date set for 11/21/2023 and resets it to 1/11/2024 at 1:30 PM. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due by 12/22/2023. The parties should a revised joint status report by 1/5/2024 that includes the status on their settlement discussions. If the parties need additional time for Defendants to respond to the complaint, they should file a motion and notice it for presentment prior to 12/22/2023. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 14, 2023 Filing 13 STATUS Report Joint by Azure Northgate LLC, Azure Partners, LLC, Harbor Group International, LLC, Harbor Group Management Co., LLC, Silver Northgate LLC (Paul, Joshua)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 11/21/2023 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' website and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 11/14/2023. Motions for leave to proceed pro hac vice #9 , #10 , and #11 are granted. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (866) 434-5269, Access Code: 8087837. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll-free number). Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/30/2023. Mailed notice (jh, )
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21270788. (Paul, Joshua)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21270718. (Rosenberg, Jessica)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21270624. (Kasowitz, Marc)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Elizabeth Richardson, Open Communities. Perq Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 9/26/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Perq Marketing, LLC waiver sent on 9/26/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Perq Software, LLC waiver sent on 9/26/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Soule, Jennifer)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Perq Holdings, LLC, Perq Marketing, LLC, Perq Software, LLC by Jillian Stacey Cole (Cole, Jillian)
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Perq Holdings, LLC, Perq Marketing, LLC, Perq Software, LLC by William J. Serritella, Jr (Serritella, William)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Open Communities, Elizabeth Richardson by James G Bradtke (Bradtke, James)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Open Communities, Elizabeth Richardson by Kelly K. Lambert (Lambert, Kelly)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Open Communities, Elizabeth Richardson by Jennifer K Soule (Soule, Jennifer)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Soule, Jennifer)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Elizabeth Richardson, Open Communities; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21140053. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Soule, Jennifer)
September 25, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jxm, )
September 25, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Communities et al v. Harbor Group Management Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Communities
Represented By: James G Bradtke
Represented By: Kelly K. Lambert
Represented By: Jennifer K Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Richardson
Represented By: James G Bradtke
Represented By: Kelly K. Lambert
Represented By: Jennifer K Soule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBOR GROUP MANAGEMENT CO., LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rosenberg
Represented By: Joshua N. Paul
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBOR GROUP INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rosenberg
Represented By: Joshua N. Paul
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZURE PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rosenberg
Represented By: Joshua N. Paul
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERQ HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Represented By: Jillian Stacey Cole
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERQ SOFTWARE, LLC
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Represented By: Jillian Stacey Cole
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERQ MARKETING, LLC
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Represented By: Jillian Stacey Cole
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZURE NORTHGATE LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rosenberg
Represented By: Joshua N. Paul
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SILVER NORTHGATE LLC
Represented By: Jessica Rosenberg
Represented By: Joshua N. Paul
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?