Kalkbrenner v. Hummingbird Funds, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Kalkbrenner
Defendant: Hummingbird Funds, LLC doing business as Blue Trust Loans, Lac Courte Oreilles Financial Services II, LLC, David Johnson, Kirk Michael Chewning, Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP, Dimension Credit (Cayman), L.P., Strategic Link Consulting, LP, Esoteric Ventures, LLC, InfoTel International Ltd., M. Mark High, Ltd., Kim Anderson, Jay Clark and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv14232
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Agreed motion to extend deadline to file joint status report #17 is granted. The date for submission of a Report of Planning Meeting is extended to 1/5/2024. Mailed notice. (cp, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Joshua Kalkbrenner for extension of time to file Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Joint Status Report (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner. M. Mark High, Ltd. waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner. Kirk Michael Chewning waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner. Jay Clark waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner. InfoTel International Ltd. waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner. David Johnson waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner. Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP waiver sent on 11/28/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (Goldstein, Matthew)
November 16, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joshua Kalkbrenner Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Kim Anderson Only (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner as to Dimension Credit (Cayman), L.P. on 10/10/2023, answer due 10/31/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner as to Strategic Link Consulting, LP on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Kalkbrenner as to Esoteric Ventures, LLC on 10/12/2023, answer due 11/2/2023. (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The parties are directed to submit a Report of Planning Meeting on or before 12/8/2023. Please see https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Mailed notice. (cp, )
October 2, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kim Anderson, Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP, Kirk Michael Chewning, Jay Clark, Dimension Credit (Cayman), L.P., Esoteric Ventures, LLC, Hummingbird Funds, LLC, InfoTel International Ltd., David Johnson, Lac Courte Oreilles Financial Services II, LLC, M. Mark High, Ltd., Strategic Link Consulting, LP (axk, )
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Kalkbrenner by Matthew J. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 28, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Kalkbrenner by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
September 28, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Kalkbrenner by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION filed by Joshua Kalkbrenner; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21158081. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Edelman, Daniel)
September 28, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axa, )
September 28, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (axa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalkbrenner v. Hummingbird Funds, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Kalkbrenner
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hummingbird Funds, LLC doing business as Blue Trust Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lac Courte Oreilles Financial Services II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Michael Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cane Bay Partners VI, LLLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimension Credit (Cayman), L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Link Consulting, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esoteric Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InfoTel International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Mark High, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?