In re Manufactured Home Lot Rents Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Jorge Zuccolotto
Defendant: Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc., Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc., Hometown America Management, L.L.C., Lakeshore Communities, Inc., Sun Communities, Inc., RHP Properties, Inc., Yes Communities, L.L.C., Inspire Communities, L.L.C., Kingsley Management, Corp., Cal-Am Properties, Inc. and Murex Properties, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2023cv14797
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2023 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kingsley Management, Corp. by Laura Ann Elkayam (Elkayam, Laura)
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kingsley Management, Corp. by Steven P. Blonder (Blonder, Steven)
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Hometown America Management, L.L.C. on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Inspire Communities, L.L.C. on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Cal-Am Properties, Inc. on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Kingsley Management, Corp. on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Sun Communities, Inc. on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Yes Communities, L.L.C. on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Zuccolotto as to Lakeshore Communities, Inc. on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Silton, Heidi)
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Thomas M. Durkin no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/31/23. (nsf, )
October 18, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Cal-Am Properties, Inc., Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc., Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc., Hometown America Management, L.L.C., Inspire Communities, L.L.C., Kingsley Management, Corp., Lakeshore Communities, Inc., Murex Properties, L.L.C., RHP Properties, Inc., Sun Communities, Inc., Yes Communities, L.L.C. (jcc, )
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Plaintiff's motion for leave to provisionally file class action complaint under seal #5 is granted. Mailed notice. (kp, )
October 13, 2023 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case pursuant to 28 USC 294(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 10/13/2023. (td, )
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Zuccolotto by Eura Chang (Chang, Eura)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Jorge Zuccolotto [Class Action Complaint] (Silton, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Jorge Zuccolotto for leave to file Class Action Complaint Provisionally Under Seal (Silton, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Zuccolotto by Joseph Charles Bourne (Bourne, Joseph)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jorge Zuccolotto by Heidi M. Silton (Silton, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Silton, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Public Redacted Version filed by Jorge Zuccolotto; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21212973.(Silton, Heidi)
October 12, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jxm, )
October 12, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Manufactured Home Lot Rents Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Zuccolotto
Represented By: Heidi M. Silton
Represented By: Eura Chang
Represented By: Joseph Charles Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Lifestyle Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometown America Management, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHP Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yes Communities, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Communities, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsley Management, Corp.
Represented By: Steven P. Blonder
Represented By: Laura Ann Elkayam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Am Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murex Properties, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?