Roman v. Triton Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Roman
Defendant: Triton Logistics, Inc. and Andrew Voveris
Case Number: 1:2023cv15146
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #16 is granted, and no appearance on the motion is necessary. Defendants' response to the complaint is due 1/8/24. By 1/11/24, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Gerald L. Maatman, Jr for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/13/2023 at 09:45 AM. (Maatman, Gerald)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Triton Logistics, Inc., Andrew Voveris for extension of time to file responsive pleading (Unopposed) (Maatman, Gerald)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Voveris on December 5, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Carlos Roman. (Smit, Rachel)
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Carlos Roman regarding Summons and Complaint served on Triton Logistics, Inc. on November 16, 2023 (Smit, Rachel)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Triton Logistics, Inc., Andrew Voveris by George J Schaller (Schaller, George)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Triton Logistics, Inc., Andrew Voveris by Alex W. Karasik (Karasik, Alex)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Triton Logistics, Inc., Andrew Voveris by Gerald L. Maatman, Jr (Maatman, Gerald)
December 4, 2023 ALIAS SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Andrew Voveris (smb, )
November 15, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carlos Roman by Hillary Schwab (Schwab, Hillary)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carlos Roman by Brant Casavant (Casavant, Brant)
November 15, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carlos Roman by Rachel Julia Smit (Smit, Rachel)
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 #5 #6 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21276072. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brant Casavant, Esq.)(Casavant, Brant)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21276016. (Smit, Rachel)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21275906. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Hillary Schwab, Esq.)(Schwab, Hillary)
October 23, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Triton Logistics, Inc., Andrew Voveris (mek,)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carlos Roman by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zouras, James)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Carlos Roman; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21240447. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Zouras, James)
October 19, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mek,)
October 19, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (mek,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roman v. Triton Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Roman
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Rachel Julia Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Alex W. Karasik
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Represented By: George J Schaller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Voveris
Represented By: Alex W. Karasik
Represented By: George J Schaller
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?