Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. Vision Painting & Decorating Services, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund and Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Defendant: Vision Painting & Decorating Services, Incorporated and Edward T. McKinnie, Jr., Individually
Case Number: 1:2023cv15161
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund regarding order #12 (James, Brian)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 12/11/2023. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Parties to take note of Judge Bucklo's motion call practice posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiffs' motion for order of default and audit order #10 is granted. Enter Order. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2024 and its Rule 26(f) report are stricken. Status hearing set for 3/11/2024 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). The parties shall file a joint written status report by 3/4/2024. The court will enter a scheduling order in response to the status report. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund for order of Default and Audit Order (James, Brian)
November 10, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund as to Vision Painting & Decorating Services, Incorporated on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023. (Piechocinski, Grant)
November 10, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund as to Edward T. McKinnie, Jr., Individually on 11/2/2023, answer due 11/23/2023. (Piechocinski, Grant)
October 27, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference is set for 1/29/2024 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance is required). The joint Rule 26(f) planning report is due 1/22/2024. (The form of the report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov.) The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (pmh)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Grant Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
October 23, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Edward T. McKinnie, Jr., Individually, Vision Painting & Decorating Services, Incorporated (khg, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Brian Christopher James (James, Brian)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Paul Michael Egan (Egan, Paul)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Grant Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Piechocinski, Grant)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21242196. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Painting Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Signed Installment Note)(Piechocinski, Grant)
October 20, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (khg, )
October 20, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. Vision Painting & Decorating Services, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: Paul Michael Egan
Represented By: Grant Piechocinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Painting & Decorating Services, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward T. McKinnie, Jr., Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?