Brown v. EssilorLuxottica, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Brown and Nedenia Udovich
Defendant: EssilorLuxottica, S.A., Luxottica Group S.p.A., Essilor International SAS, EssilorLuxottica USA Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Essilor of America Holding Company, Inc., Luxottica Of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., EyeMed Vision Care, LLC and Vision Source, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv15176
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lindsay C Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Nedenia Udovich to reassign case [ Unopposed Motion to Relate and Reassign Udovich Action Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian M. Hogan, #2 Ex. 1 - Udovich Complaint (1:23-cv-15854))(Hogan, Brian)
December 15, 2023 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The joint motion to extend the served Defendants' response deadline #23 is granted. The served Defendants' deadline to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to February 29, 2024 Mailed notice (cn).
December 14, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Essilor of America, Inc., EssilorLuxottica USA Inc., EyeMed Vision Care, LLC, Luxottica Of America, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Vision Source, LLC for extension of time to file Response to Complaint #1 (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Vision Source, LLC (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Luxottica Of America, Inc. (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by EyeMed Vision Care, LLC (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by EssilorLuxottica USA Inc. (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp. (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Essilor of America, Inc. (Yates, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The briefing schedule set #4 is stricken. The initial status hearing set for January 10, 2024 #3 is stricken. By January 5, 2024, the parties shall file a status report as the motion to transfer to MDL. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: Attorney Christopher S. Yates added. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21411860. (Yates, Christopher)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21411854. (Lee, Belinda)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kelly Brown. Essilor of America, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (Malmstrom, Carl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kelly Brown. Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (Malmstrom, Carl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kelly Brown. EssilorLuxottica USA Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (Malmstrom, Carl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kelly Brown. EyeMed Vision Care, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (Malmstrom, Carl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kelly Brown. Luxottica Of America, Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (Malmstrom, Carl)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kelly Brown. Vision Source, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. (Malmstrom, Carl)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: Plaintiff's response to the motion to transfer #4 pursuant to 28 USC 1407 is due by December 21, 2023; any reply is due by January 3, 2024. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendants Essilor International SAS, Essilor of America Holding Company, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., EssilorLuxottica USA Inc., EssilorLuxottica, S.A., EyeMed Vision Care, LLC, Luxottica Group S.p.A., Luxottica Of America, Inc., Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp., Vision Source, LLC to transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1407. (Exhibits). (jn, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: In person initial status hearing set for 1/10/2024 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 1/5/2024. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found at Judge Jenkins's web page @ (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, "District Judges", to "Judge Lindsay Jenkins", to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures"). The parties must follow all the standing orders for Judge Jenkins and all Local Rules, which can be found at the same web page. At the Initial Status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; and (3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. If you need to appear virtually, contact Judge Jenkins' courtroom deputy at least three business days in advance of the hearing to make the request. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kelly Brown by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) filed by Kelly Brown; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21243659. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl)
October 20, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (khg, )
October 20, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (khg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. EssilorLuxottica, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Brown
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nedenia Udovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EssilorLuxottica, S.A.
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essilor International SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EssilorLuxottica USA Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica U.S. Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essilor of America Holding Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica Of America, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essilor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EyeMed Vision Care, LLC
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Source, LLC
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?