Ivy et al v. Zeigler BMW of Orland Park et al
Plaintiff: Edicott M Ivy and Sheri Smith
Defendant: Zeigler BMW of Orland Park, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, BMW FS Securties, LLC, US Bank, NA, BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A and Does 5-100 Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2023cv15318
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Lindsay C Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #16 is due by January 8, 2024. Defendant's reply is due by January 22, 2024. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by BMW FS Securties, LLC, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A, US Bank, NA, Zeigler BMW of Orland Park in support of motion to dismiss #16 Ivy-Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss (Laser, Thomas)
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants US Bank, NA, Zeigler BMW of Orland Park, BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A, Does, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, BMW FS Securties, LLC to dismiss Ivy-Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Laser, Thomas)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A by Thomas Laser (Laser, Thomas)
November 30, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BMW FS Securties, LLC, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, US Bank, NA by Thomas Laser (Laser, Thomas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Bank, NA on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (jh, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Zeigler BMW of Orland Park on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (jh, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC on 11/13/2023, answer due 12/4/2023. (jh, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (jh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2023: #1 Proof of Service) (jh, ).
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED, for document # sent to Sheri Smith returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (nsf, )
November 1, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BMW FS Securties, LLC, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A, US Bank, NA, Zeigler BMW of Orland Park (evw, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: In person initial status hearing set for 1/10/2024 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2119. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 1/5/2024. The report should comply with the requirements set forth in the Initial Status Report standing order, which can be found at Judge Jenkins's web page @ (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, "District Judges", to "Judge Lindsay Jenkins", to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures"). The parties must follow all the standing orders for Judge Jenkins and all Local Rules, which can be found at the same web page. At the Initial Status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; and (3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. If you need to appear virtually, contact Judge Jenkins' courtroom deputy at least three business days in advance of the hearing to make the request. The courtroom deputy will inform you as to whether your request has been approved. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The order entered 10/27/2023 #6 is amended. Plaintiff is directed to complete a summons form for each Defendant and return them to the Clerks' Office at 219. S. Dearborn Street, 20th Floor, Chicago, Illinois, 60604, for issuance. The Clerk is instructed to issue summonses for service of the complaint. Once summonses for Defendants issue, Plaintiff is reminded of Plaintiff's obligation to complete service on each Defendant under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Plaintiff is notified that if a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court must dismiss the action without prejudice. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 27, 2023 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins: The Clerk is instructed to issue summonses for service of the complaint. Once summonses for Defendants issue, Plaintiff is reminded of Plaintiff's obligation to complete service on each Defendant under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Plaintiff is notified that if a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court must dismiss the action without prejudice. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 26, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (nsf, )
October 26, 2023 MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to plaintiffs. (nsf, )
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Sheri Smith. (nsf, )
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Edicott M Ivy (nsf, )
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (nsf, )
October 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sheri Smith, Edicoh M Ivy. (Exhibits) (nsf, )
October 25, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Lindsay C. Jenkins. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (nsf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivy et al v. Zeigler BMW of Orland Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edicott M Ivy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeigler BMW of Orland Park
Represented By: Thomas Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW FS Securties, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, NA
Represented By: Thomas Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW Vehicle Owner Trust 2022-A
Represented By: Thomas Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 5-100 Inclusive
Represented By: Thomas Laser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?