Kaschak v. Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Kaschak
Defendant: Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv15452
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The unopposed motion for extension of time (Dckt. No. #11 ) is granted. Defendant shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by January 8, 2024. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC (Hletko, Valerie)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC for extension of time to respond to complaint (Hletko, Valerie)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC by Valerie Lynn Hletko (Hletko, Valerie)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC by Julie B. Porter (Porter, Julie)
November 2, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: There is no need for a certificate of service for a court filing when all parties of record receive a copy through CM/ECF. Under the Local Rules, "[a] certificate of service is required only when service of a document filed on the Court's E-Filing system is made on a recipient who is not an E-Filer listed on the docket of the proceeding." See L.R. 5.5(a); see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(B) ("No certificate of service is required when a paper is served by filing it with the court's electronic-filing system."). The Court handles service through CM/ECF. In effect, the CM/ECF header is the certificate of service. Save yourself the work, and the trouble. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 2, 2023 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by January 16, 2024. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. All parties must participate in the preparation and filing of the Joint Initial Status Report. The Court requires a joint report, so a filing by one side or the other is not sufficient. Second, the parties must email a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan D. Kaschak as to Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023. (Edelman, Daniel)
October 31, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC (jcc, )
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonathan D. Kaschak by Ingrid Leonore Hofeldt (Hofeldt, Ingrid)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonathan D. Kaschak by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jonathan D. Kaschak by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jonathan D. Kaschak; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21276222. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D)(Edelman, Daniel)
October 30, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (evw, )
October 30, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (evw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaschak v. Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Kaschak
Represented By: Ingrid Leonore Hofeldt
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Healthcare Group, LLC
Represented By: Valerie Lynn Hletko
Represented By: Julie B. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?