Bewley et al v. The National Collegiate Athletic Association
Plaintiff: Matthew Bewley and Ryan Bewley
Defendant: The National Collegiate Athletic Association
Case Number: 1:2023cv15570
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUR-REPLY by Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association to motion for reconsideration #26 , response in support of motion #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holmes, Patricia)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: National Collegiate Athletic Association's Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Plead #28 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 3/1/2024. Mailed notice (cn).
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Blumenreich, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: In light of plaintiffs filing a motion for reconsideration of the court's denial of plaintiff's request for a Temporary Restraining Order #26 , relying on plaintiffs' "reply" in support of their motion for a Preliminary Injunction #25 that raises a number of arguments for the first time, the hearing previously set for 12/14/2023 is cancelled. Defendant is given leave to respond to plaintiffs' "reply" #25 and motion for reconsideration #26 on or before 12/29/2023. Plaintiffs may file a final reply in support of their motion to reconsider on or before 1/12/2024. This matter is set for hearing in person on 1/25/2024 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (cn).
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley for reconsideration regarding motion for temporary restraining order #3 (Price, Dominique)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE by Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewleyin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Price, Dominique)
December 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: On review of the parties' Joint Status Report #23 , as set forth in the court's order entered on 11/14/2023 #21 , plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #3 remains pending. The court will address a briefing schedule on the motion at the hearing on 12/14/2023 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley (Price, Dominique)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on November 14, 2023 before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Order Number: 47349. Court Reporter Contact Information: Nancy_Bistany@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2024. (Bistany, Nancy)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: In court hearing Motion for Temporary Restraining order and Preliminary Injunction held on 11/14/2023. All parties appeared at the hearing. National Collegiate Athletic Association's Agreed Motion For Leave To File Under Seal #20 is granted. For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 is denied. The motion for preliminary injunction #3 remains pending. In court hearing set for 12/14/2023 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on or before 12/7/2023. Mailed notice (cn).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association to seal (Agreed) (Holmes, Patricia)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association / Exhibits A, B, and H through K regarding declaration, #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I, #4 Exhibit J, #5 Exhibit K)(Holmes, Patricia)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of Douglas Healey regarding response in opposition to motion #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N, #9 Exhibit O)(Holmes, Patricia)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE by The National Collegiate Athletic Associationin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction #3 (Holmes, Patricia)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The National Collegiate Athletic Association (Holmes, Patricia)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association by Matthew Alan Blumenreich (Blumenreich, Matthew)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association by Brian O'Connor Watson (Watson, Brian)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley. The National Collegiate Athletic Association waiver sent on 11/2/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (Price, Dominique)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley by Daniel William McGrath (McGrath, Daniel)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: At the parties' request and by agreement, hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #3 set for 11/7/2023 is stricken and reset to 11/14/2023 at 9:45 a.m. Plaintiff is to serve defendant with notice of this hearing. Mailed notice (cn).
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley Exhibits C & D filed under seal re: (1) Complaint regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Price, Dominique)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley by Marcos Reilly (Reilly, Marcos)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal #5 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #3 set for 11/7/2023 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff is to serve defendant with notice of this hearing. Mailed notice (cn).
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcm)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jcm)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley for leave to file Under Seal (Price, Dominique)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE by Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewleyin Support of MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction #3 (Price, Dominique)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley for temporary restraining order and Preliminary Injunction (Price, Dominique)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley by Dominique Allen Price (Price, Dominique)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Bewley, Ryan Bewley; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21288058. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Dominique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bewley et al v. The National Collegiate Athletic Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bewley
Represented By: Dominique Allen Price
Represented By: Daniel William McGrath
Represented By: Marcos Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Bewley
Represented By: Dominique Allen Price
Represented By: Daniel William McGrath
Represented By: Marcos Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Represented By: Matthew Alan Blumenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?