Jeannie Griggs et al v. PAC 12 Conference et al
Plaintiff: Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson
Defendant: PAC 12 Conference and NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2023cv15673
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2023 Filing 33 RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:23-cv-06926. (ph, )
November 6, 2023 Filing 32 Conditional Transfer Order - 53 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2492, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Illinois and assigned to Honorable Manish S. Shah. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #30 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court APPROVES the parties' Stipulation and GRANTS NCAA an extension to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint until December 4, 2023. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
November 2, 2023 Filing 30 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/4/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan M. Saper, #2 Proposed Order)(Saper, Nathan) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
November 2, 2023 Filing 29 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association, (Saper, Nathan) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
October 4, 2023 Filing 28 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to National Collegiate Athletic Association answer now due 11/3/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association.(Attorney Nathan Matthew Saper added to party National Collegiate Athletic Association(pty:dft))(Saper, Nathan) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs, upon Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association served on 9/18/2023, answer due 10/10/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Eyerly, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Fernelius to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson, designating Patrick DeBlase as local counsel #22 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Hartle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson, designating Patrick DeBlase as local counsel #21 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson, designating Patrick DeBlase as local counsel #20 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Fernelius to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/31/2023, Receipt No. 35962597) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Eyerly, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Hartle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/31/2023, Receipt No. 35962435) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Eyerly, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 6, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/31/2023, Receipt No. 35960924) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Eyerly, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER IN RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35960924) #14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Fernelius to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35962597) #16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/31/2023, Receipt No. 35962435) #17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Hartle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35962435) #15 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken. (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Fernelius to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35962597) #16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/31/2023, Receipt No. 35962435) #17 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Hartle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35962435) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Proposed orders have not been flattened causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
September 5, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35960924) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Application and Proposed order have not been flattened causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 17 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 9/5/23 SEE DOCKET NO. 23] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/31/2023, Receipt No. 35962435) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Eyerly, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2023 (rolm). [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 9/5/23 SEE DOCKET NO. 23] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas A. Fernelius to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35962597) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Eyerly, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2023 (rolm). [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 15 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 9/5/23 SEE DOCKET NO. 23] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James B. Hartle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35962435) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Eyerly, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2023 (rolm). [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 9/5/23 SEE DOCKET NO. 23] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D'Arcy L.R. Rapp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jeannie Griggs (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35960924) filed by Jeannie Griggs and Jasmine Patterson Jeannie Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Michael C Eyerly added to party Jeannie Griggs(pty:pla)) (Eyerly, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2023 (rolm). [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nick Fernelius. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jim Hartle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney DArcy L.R. Rapp. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Justin Shrader. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants National Collegiate Athletic Association, PAC 12 Conference. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs, Jasmine Patterson, (Logan, Todd) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs, Jasmine Patterson. (Logan, Todd) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs, Jasmine Patterson. (Logan, Todd) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35906710 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Jeannie Griggs, Jasmine Patterson. (Attorney Todd Michael Logan added to party Jeannie Griggs(pty:pla), Attorney Todd Michael Logan added to party Jasmine Patterson(pty:pla))(Logan, Todd) [Transferred from California Central on 11/16/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeannie Griggs et al v. PAC 12 Conference et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Griggs
Represented By: Todd Michael Logan
Represented By: D'Arcy L.R. Rapp
Represented By: JAMES B HARTLE
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Nicholas A. Fernelius
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Patterson
Represented By: Todd Michael Logan
Represented By: D'Arcy L.R. Rapp
Represented By: JAMES B HARTLE
Represented By: Nicholas A. Fernelius
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAC 12 Conference
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Nathan Matthew Saper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?