Brown v. Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Brown
Defendant: Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc., Equity LifeStyle Properties, Inc., Hometown America Management, L.L.C., Lakeshore Communities, Inc., Sun Communities, Inc., RHP Properties, Inc., Yes! Communities, Inc., Inspire Communities, L.L.C., Kingsley Management, Corp. and Cal-Am Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv15763
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: In view of the filing of a consolidated amended complaint in Case No. 1:23-cv-06715, R. 127, this case is administratively closed. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (axc).
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings; pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John F. Kness no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/14/2023. (rc, )
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 11/28/2023: Telephonic initial status hearing is set for 1/18/2024 at 9:00 AM. Consistent with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference in advance of the initial status hearing. No later than ten days before the status hearing, the parties shall jointly complete and file on the docket a report that provides the information required by the Court's model Joint Initial Status Report, which can be found at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?Iu9/vqz23r5X7AkWx/nLtg== (see link entitled "Joint Initial Status Report"). If all Defendants have not yet been served or have not yet responded to requests to draft the required Joint Initial Status Report, Plaintiff must file the report on its own and must inform the Court of that circumstance. The parties are to use the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, conference code 3796759. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Mailed notice(ef, )
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kingsley Management, Corp. by Laura Ann Elkayam (Elkayam, Laura)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kingsley Management, Corp. by Steven P. Blonder (Blonder, Steven)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file under seal #3 is granted. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Brown by Michael E. Moskovitz (Moskovitz, Michael)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Brown by Robert J. Wozniak (Wozniak, Robert)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Brown by Kimberly Ann Justice (Justice, Kimberly)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Brown by Nia-imara Atu Barberousse Binns (Binns, Nia-imara)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Steven Brown Class Action Complaint (Justice, Kimberly)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Steven Brown for leave to file Class Action Complaint Provisionally Under Seal (Justice, Kimberly)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Justice, Kimberly)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Public Redacted Complaint filed by Steven Brown; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21309835.(Justice, Kimberly)
November 8, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jxm, )
November 8, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jxm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Brown
Represented By: Michael E. Moskovitz
Represented By: Nia-imara Atu Barberousse Binns
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datacomp Appraisal Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity LifeStyle Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometown America Management, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHP Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yes! Communities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Communities, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsley Management, Corp.
Represented By: Steven P. Blonder
Represented By: Laura Ann Elkayam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Am Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?