Kayomi Harai v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Kayomi Harai
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, Jiahualiren, WEISIMA STORE, zhaowenfeishangmao Co. ltd, suyingshangmao, FKELYI, Zhengqian Store, JenniferLiz, Dongguan Meiya Trading Co., Gogomarket, Yarong Store, EOTVIA STORE, Likede Store, Hengxinshuo, Xuhangla, TRF STORE, Yinuoxi Store, Cuke, PinShui Co.Ltd, Moobody, Exclusive OutLet, World Deal, Yubatuo Co. Ltd, WQQZJJ, Corashan Co., Ltd., KuRLing, Yutaosen, LINNAO Ltd, New Technic Toys, AceGO, IWRUHZY Co. ltd, Scnor Home, Household Goods, Feternal, QWANG SEA, Wanning Langrun Co., Ltd., Dealovy Co.Ltd, Yomiee HOME&OUTDOORS, Mouliraty, Herrnalise and Amacok
Case Number: 1:2023cv15960
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: LaShonda A Hunt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai regarding set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,, terminate hearings,,, #38 (Vogt, Keith)
January 12, 2024 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #35 against the remaining defendants identified in Second Amended Schedule A [35-1]. All remaining defendants have failed either to plead or to otherwise appear to defend against this action. Accordingly, default against all defendants on Amended Schedule A is entered under Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Any objections to the motion for entry of default judgment by the defaulted Defendants must be filed on or before 1/26/24. If no objections are filed by that date, the Court will consider the motion unopposed. Plaintiff must serve this minute order upon all remaining affected Defendants within one business day of its entry on the docket and must promptly file proof of that service. No appearance is necessary on 1/16/24. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
January 11, 2024 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #35 before Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 1/16/2024 at 10:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
January 11, 2024 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM by Kayomi Harai in support of motion for default judgment #35 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
January 11, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for default judgment as to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against the Defendants Identified in Second Amended Schedule A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vogt, Keith)
January 6, 2024 NEW PARTIES: Jiahualiren, WEISIMA STORE, zhaowenfeishangmao Co. ltd, suyingshangmao, FKELYI, Zhengqian Store, JenniferLiz, Dongguan Meiya Trading Co., Gogomarket, Yarong Store, EOTVIA STORE, Likede Store, Hengxinshuo, Xuhangla, TRF STORE, Yinuoxi Store, Cuke, PinShui Co.Ltd, Moobody, Exclusive OutLet, World Deal, Yubatuo Co. Ltd, WQQZJJ, Corashan Co., Ltd., KuRLing, Yutaosen, LINNAO Ltd, New Technic Toys, AceGO, IWRUHZY Co. ltd, Scnor Home, Household Goods, Feternal, QWANG SEA, Wanning Langrun Co., Ltd., Dealovy Co.Ltd, Yomiee HOME&OUTDOORS, Mouliraty, Herrnalise and Amacok added to case caption. (Vogt, Keith)
January 4, 2024 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Minute entry #31 is entered in error and amended to reflect the following: Telephonic motion hearing held. Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction #24 , which the Court now considers unopposed because no Defendant filed a notice of objection by the 1/3/24 deadline or appeared at the hearing. Plaintiff's filings establish that it has acted expeditiously to protect its interests and that there remains a significant risk that Defendants will transfer relevant assets beyond the Court's reach. For these reasons, as well as the reasons provided in the whole of Plaintiff's filings and as stated by the Court on the record and in connection with entry of the TRO #21 , the Court is persuaded that Plaintiff has satisfied the requirements for a preliminary injunction. In addition, the Court finds that the balance of harms favors Plaintiff and that a preliminary injunction serves the public interest by, among other things, protecting consumers from the marketing of counterfeit goods. Plaintiff has also certified and established #27 that it provided electronic notice to defendants of the pendency of this case and provided a link to a website containing relevant case documents, but no objection to the motion for a preliminary injunction has been filed on behalf of any defendant. Enter Preliminary Injunction order. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all defendants listed on Second Amended Schedule A #18 are added to the court's docket within five business days. The Clerk is requested to unseal any previously sealed documents. Mailed notice (ags)
January 4, 2024 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Preliminary injunctive relief has been entered against the remaining defendants who have not appeared in this case #32 . Summons were executed on 12/14/23, and Defendants' responses to the complaint are due by 1/4/24 #27 . By 2/9/24, Plaintiff is ordered to file any motions for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). If there are any remaining defendants against whom default and default judgment are not being sought, Plaintiff is ordered to file by the same date a status report identifying each defendant against whom this case is proceeding and state whether the parties anticipate a settlement or further litigation. Mailed notice (ags)
January 4, 2024 Filing 32 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 1/4/2024. Mailed notice (ags)
January 4, 2024 Filing 31 ENTERED IN ERROR. Docket text modified on 1/4/2024 (ags).
December 28, 2023 Filing 30 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 15, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai regarding order on motion for preliminary injunction,,,,,, terminate hearings,,,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,, #28 (Vogt, Keith)
December 15, 2023 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 is taken under advisement. A telephonic motion hearing is set for 1/4/24, at 10:00 AM. Attorneys/parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. The motion may be considered unopposed as to any Defendant who does not file an objection by 1/3/24, and/or appear at the telephonic hearing. For the reasons stated in the Court's initial order entering the TRO #21 , the TRO is extended to and including the date the Court adjudicates the motion for a preliminary injunction. See H-D Mich., LLC v. Hellenic Duty Free Shops S.A., 694 F.3d 827, 843-45 (7th Cir. 2012). Because this extension exceeds the maximum duration for a TRO under Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b), this extension "becomes in effect a preliminary injunction that is appealable, but the order remains effective." Id. at 844. Plaintiff must serve a copy of this minute order upon all affected Defendants within one business day of its entry on the docket and promptly file proof of that service. No appearance is necessary on 12/19/23. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 14, 2023 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kayomi Harai as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service, Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
December 14, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #24 before Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
December 14, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Kayomi Harai in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Keith Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
December 14, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
December 13, 2023 Filing 23 SURETY BOND in the amount of $20,000 posted by Kayomi Harai. (Document not scanned) (aee, )
December 8, 2023 Filing 22 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 12/8/2023. Emailed notice to plaintiff's counsel.
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication 13 is granted. Plaintiff's written submissions establish that if defendants were informed of this proceeding before a TRO could issue, assets would likely be redirected, defeating plaintiff's interests in identifying defendants, stopping the infringement, and obtaining an accounting. The Court finds that (1) the submitted evidence establishes a likelihood of success on the merits (including evidence of active infringement and sales into Illinois); (2) the harm to plaintiff is irreparable and cannot be fully compensated by money damages; (3) an injunction is in the public interest because of the consumer confusion caused by counterfeit goods and infringement interferes with Plaintiff's ability to control its intellectual property; and (4) there is no countervailing harm to defendants from an order directing them to stop infringement. Electronic service of process does not violate any treaty and is consistent with due process because it is an effective way to communicate with these online marketplace defendants. Expedited discovery is warranted to identify defendants and implement the asset freeze. If any defendant were to appear and object, the Court will revisit the asset freeze, joinder, and personal jurisdiction. A $20,000 bond is sufficient to secure the injunctive relief. Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. No appearance is necessary on 12/14/23. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 8, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (evw, )
December 5, 2023 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai Sealed Exhibit 2, Declaration of Kayomi Harai regarding sealed document #18 , set deadlines,,,,,,,,,,,,,, set/reset hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,, #17 , memorandum in support of motion, #14 , declaration #19 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1)(Vogt, Keith)
December 5, 2023 Filing 19 DECLARATION regarding sealed document #18 , set deadlines,,,,,,,,,,,,,, set/reset hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,, #17 [Amended] Declaration of Kayomi Harai (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, filed under seal)(Vogt, Keith)
December 5, 2023 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai Second Amended Schedule A to Complaint #1 and Schedule A to Complaint #2 (Vogt, Keith)
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Upon review of the Complaint #1 and Amended Schedule A #10 , the Court questions whether Plaintiff plausibly alleges that the 53 defendants here are sufficiently connected to satisfy the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 20(a)(2) for joinder. Both Estee Lauder v. Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 182 (N.D. Ill. 2020) and Bose Corp. v. Schedule A, 334 F.R.D. 511 (N.D. Ill. 2020) are instructive on this issue. Courts have "'considerable discretion' and 'flexibility' in determining whether the plaintiff has plausibly alleged such a relationship." Bose Corp., 334 F.R.D. at 513. An important consideration in Schedule A cases with numerous online marketplaces and sellers whose only sufficiently alleged connection is that they are all accused of selling counterfeit products that infringe upon Plaintiff's intellectual property rights is "whether the permissive joinder of a party will comport with the principles of fundamental fairness." Estee Lauder, 334 F.R.D. at 186 (citing Chavez v. Ill. State Police, 251 F.3d 612, 632 (7th Cir. 2001)). In making this assessment, the Court must balance various factors: (1) the continuing harm to plaintiffs who seek immediate relief from courts to protect their intellectual property rights and prevent further economic loss; (2) the due process rights of defendants against whom ex parte relief, including the extraordinary remedy of freezing all their assets without notice and potentially ruining a legitimate business, is sought; and (3) the interest in promoting judicial economy as courts must quickly and efficiently evaluate hundreds of pages of evidentiary submissions to ensure that injunctive relief is warranted. Estee Lauder also instructs that conclusory allegations concerning the interrelatedness of defendants are not enough to support joinder, facts must be alleged. 334 F.R.D. at 185 & 188. In this case, Plaintiff has alleged only conclusions regarding a connection between the 53 Defendants and filed hundreds of pages of evidence to prove their alleged infringement. Under these circumstances, the Court declines to exercise its discretion to allow permissive joinder of all 53 defendants. However, after taking the aforementioned factors into consideration, the Court has generally allowed plaintiffs in Schedule A counterfeit products cases to proceed with no more than 40 defendants, which is far more manageable for a single case. That is less burdensome to plaintiffs, defendants, and the judicial system. Accordingly, consistent with this ruling, Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Schedule A and an amended declaration in support of the pending TRO motion 13 that specifically identifies the relevant pages where evidence pertaining to each Second Amended Schedule A defendant can be found in the prior voluminous submissions, by 12/11/23. This case is set for an in-person hearing on 12/14/23, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1425. If Plaintiff chooses to amend its filings, the hearing date will be stricken. Otherwise, Plaintiff may submit a written response to this order, not to exceed 5 pages, by 12/11/23, and appear at the hearing to present further argument. Plaintiff's TRO motion 13 taken under advisement until the joinder issue is resolved. Emailed notice. (cdh, )
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #11 and motion for leave to file excess pages #12 are granted. Schedule A #2 and Amended Schedule A #10 to the Complaint and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Kayomi Harai #15 shall remain under seal. Plaintiff is granted leave instanter to exceed the page limit and file a 24-page brief in support of its TRO motion #14 . Emailed notice. (cdh, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai Sealed Exhibit 2, Declaration of Kayomi Harai regarding memorandum in support of motion, #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1)(Vogt, Keith)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in support of 13 Exparte motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-4, of Keith A. Vogt's declaration, #3 Declaration of Kayomi Harai, #4 Exhibit 1, of Kayomi Harai's declaration)(Vogt, Keith)
November 21, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai [Amended] Schedule A to Complaint #1 and Schedule A #2 (Vogt, Keith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
November 15, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kayomi Harai by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kayomi Harai Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kayomi Harai; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21331587. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith)
November 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jcc, )
November 15, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 3). (jcc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayomi Harai v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayomi Harai
Represented By: Adam Grodman
Represented By: Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Represented By: Monica Rita Martin
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiahualiren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEISIMA STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhaowenfeishangmao Co. ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: suyingshangmao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FKELYI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhengqian Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JenniferLiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Meiya Trading Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gogomarket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarong Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOTVIA STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Likede Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hengxinshuo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xuhangla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRF STORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yinuoxi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PinShui Co.Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moobody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exclusive OutLet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yubatuo Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WQQZJJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corashan Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KuRLing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yutaosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINNAO Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Technic Toys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AceGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IWRUHZY Co. ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scnor Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Goods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Feternal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QWANG SEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanning Langrun Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dealovy Co.Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yomiee HOME&OUTDOORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mouliraty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrnalise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amacok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?