Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London et al v. Surgrade Solutions LLC, et al
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON and HDI Global Specialty SE
Defendant: SUBGRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, SOLID GROUND CONSULTING ENGINEERS, LLC, Does 1 through 25, Inclusive and Surgrade Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv16146
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion To Amend Their Complaint As A Matter Of Course Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B) #19 is granted. Plaintiff is granted leave to file their amended complaint on or before 2/5/2024. Defendant Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC's motion to dismiss #16 is terminated without prejudice. Mailed notice (cn).
January 19, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, HDI Global Specialty SE to amend/correct complaint, #1 as a matter of course pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(B) (Obiala, Matthew)
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The court sets the following briefing schedule on defendant Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, PLLC's Motion To Dismiss: plaintiffs' response due 2/20/2024; defendant Solid Ground's reply due 3/12/2024. The court will issue its ruling on CM/ECF. Mailed notice (cn).
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 (Perry, Kenneth)
January 16, 2024 Filing 16 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC (Perry, Kenneth)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report on this court's form by 1/30/2024. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (cn).
January 15, 2024 Filing 14 Subgrade Solutions LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Surgrade Solutions LLC against Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC . by Surgrade Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Farrell, Sean)
December 28, 2023 Filing 13 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Subgrade Solutions LLC's Unopposed Motion For An Extension Of Time To Answer Or To Otherwise Plead #11 is granted. Defendant Subgrade's responsive pleading due on or before 1/15/2024. Mailed notice (cn).
December 22, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Surgrade Solutions LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise Plead (Farrell, Sean)
December 22, 2023 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Surgrade Solutions LLC by Sean Patrick Farrell (Farrell, Sean)
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, PLLC's Unopposed Motion For An Extension Of Time To Answer Or To Otherwise Plead #8 is granted. Solid Ground Consulting's responsive pleading due on or before 1/15/2024. Mailed notice (cn).
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC for extension of time Unopposed (Perry, Kenneth)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC by Kenneth A. Perry (Perry, Kenneth)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London for disclosure of Local Rule 3.2 affiliates (Obiala, Matthew).
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Plaintiff HDI Global Specialty SE for disclosure of Local Rule 3.2 affiliates (Obiala, Matthew).
November 27, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Solid Ground Consulting Engineers, LLC, Surgrade Solutions LLC (khg, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Pursuant to LR 3.2, Plaintiff is directed to file a Notification as to Affiliates by 11/27/2023. Mailed notice (cn).
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON, HDI Global Specialty SE by Matthew J. Obiala (Obiala, Matthew)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON, HDI Global Specialty SE by William Chandler Swallow (Swallow, William)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON, HDI Global Specialty SE; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21352169. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swallow, William)
November 21, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (axa, )
November 21, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeannice W. Appenteng. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (axa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London et al v. Surgrade Solutions LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON
Represented By: Matthew J. Obiala
Represented By: William Chandler Swallow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Matthew J. Obiala
Represented By: William Chandler Swallow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBGRADE SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLID GROUND CONSULTING ENGINEERS, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth A. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgrade Solutions LLC
Represented By: Sean Patrick Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?