Savage v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Savage
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc., Actavis LLC, Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sandoz Inc, Accord Healthcare, Inc., Hospira Inc, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Pfizer Inc, Actavis Pharma Inc, Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Mckesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd. and Actavis Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv16162
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 16 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S CITIZENSHIP DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dawn Savage (Mura, Andre)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dawn Savage by Andre M. Mura (Mura, Andre)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The parties' notice of pending settlement and request to stay proceedings #12 is granted. Proceedings are stayed until further order of the Court. The telephonic status hearing set for 1/23/2024 and the joint reassignment status report deadline of 1/16/2024 #11 are stricken. By 5/24/2024, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of the settlement. Mailed notice (lma, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC for settlement (Pending) and Request to Stay Proceedings (Northrip, William)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: The case having been transferred to this Court, a telephonic status hearing is set for 1/23/2024 at 10:00 AM. By 1/16/2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed 5 pages. A template for the Reassignment Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found on the Court's website at on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Cases Reassigned to Judge Andrea R. Wood. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (lma, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Corporate Disclosure Statements (Northrip, William)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by William Francis Northrip (Northrip, William)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 RECEIVED from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-08150 (gcy)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
August 24, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (tm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6322077) filed by Dawn Savage. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)Attorney Karen Barth Menzies added to party Dawn Savage(pty:pla).(Menzies, Karen) Modified text on 8/24/2017 (tm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savage v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Jousef Midhet Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jousef Midhet Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Jousef Midhet Shkoukani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mckesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jousef Midhet Shkoukani
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Savage
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Amy M Zeman
Represented By: Eric H. Gibbs
Represented By: Andre M. Mura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?